California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:25-cv-01428
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 2:51 AM PDT
Defendant
Seth Cohen
Represented By
Marie C Mirch
Mirch Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Terry Harvey
Represented By
Jonah A. Grossbardt
Freundlich Law Apc
contact info
Defendant
Living The Dream Management, LLC
Represented By
Jonah A. Grossbardt
Freundlich Law Apc
contact info
Defendant
Sal Michaels
Represented By
Marie C Mirch
Mirch Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Pyramid Entertainment Group
Represented By
Marie C Mirch
Mirch Law Firm
contact info
Kevin John Mirch
Mirch Law Firm. LLP
contact info
Defendant
Waikiki Entertainment Group, LLC
Defendant
Andre Wilson
Defendant
Brian Wilson
Defendant
Casey Wilson
Defendant
Linda Wilson
personally and as personal representative of the Estate of Ronnie J. Wilson 310 E. 34th Street N., Apt. A
Tulsa, OK 74106
Defendant
Cruisingagents.com, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey G Jacobs
Law Office Of Jeffrey G. Jacobs
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Yoshis Japanese Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By
Corban Porter
Donahue Fitzgerald LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Kent Wilson
Represented By
Aaron Matthew Levine
Buchalter Apc
contact info
Matthew Lawrence Seror
Buchalter Apc
contact info
Stephen J Strauss
Buchalter Nemer PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
79 79 answer Answer to Crossclaim Third Party Complaint Wed 05/14 4:49 PM
ANSWER to Crossclaim, Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim,57 , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Watchout Entertainment, Inc., Watchout Management, Inc., Mark Elliot, CROSSCLAIM against Terry Harvey filed by Defendant and Cross-Claimant Yoshis Japanese Restaurant, Inc..(Porter, Corban)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement
78 78 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 05/14 4:02 PM
Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Attorney Linda Wilson.(Wiggins, Marcus)
Related: [-]
77 77 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 05/14 11:51 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)75 by Judge George H Wu. Docket No. 75 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice76 filed on May 13, 2025. (aco)
Related: [-]
76 76 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 05/14 8:51 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)75 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect document is attached to the docket entry. Document has been filed as an Answer. Document attached to the docket entry is not an Answer. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (aco)
Related: [-]
cmp Third Party Complaint Thu 05/15 9:50 AM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Third-Party Defendants Mark Elliot, Watchout Entertainment, Inc., Watchout Management, Inc., filed by Third-Party Plaintiff Yoshis Japanese Restaurant, Inc. (SEE DOCKET ENTRY79 FOR THE ATTACHMENT) (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
75 75 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/13 10:45 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Attorney Linda Wilson.(Wiggins, Marcus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
74 74 service Summons Issued Thu 05/08 8:48 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint as to Third-Party Defendant Watchout Entertainment Inc. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
73 73 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Wed 05/07 5:36 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marcus B Wiggins counsel for Defendant Linda Wilson. Adding Marcus Wiggins as counsel of record for Linda Wilson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Marcus Wiggins. (Attorney Marcus B Wiggins added to party Linda Wilson(pty:dft))(Wiggins, Marcus)
Related: [-]
72 72 notice Summons Request Wed 05/07 5:05 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint filed by Third Party Plaintiff Pyramid Entertainment Group. (Mirch, Marie)
Related: [-]
71 71 notice Deficiency in Summons Wed 05/07 4:47 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request70 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached." Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (aco)
Related: [-]
70 70 notice Summons Request Wed 05/07 10:19 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint filed by Third Party Plaintiff Pyramid Entertainment Group. (Mirch, Marie)
Related: [-]