Padilla v. Immigration, et al.
California Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jennifer L Thurston |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-00221 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 20, 2025 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Southern, 1:25-cv-00083 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 2:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
Google Company
|
|
Defendant
Immigration
|
|
Defendant
Military Government
|
|
Plaintiff
Juan Covarrubias Padilla
421 N. Devon Ave.
Indianapolis, IN 46219 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, April 18, 2025 | ||
15 | 15
![]() JUDGMENT dated *4/18/2025* pursuant to order. (Deputy Clerk CRM) |
|
14 | 14
![]() ORDER ADOPTING12 Findings and Recommendations, Dismissing the Action With Prejudice, and Directing the Clerk of Court to Close the Case, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/18/2025. CASE CLOSED. (Deputy Clerk CRM) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Fri 04/18 9:43 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:14 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations,15 Judgment served on Juan Covarrubias Padilla. (Deputy Clerk CRM) |
||
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER (1) DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; and (2) DENYING3 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's1 Complaint be Dismissed with Prejudice and Without Leave to Amend as Frivolous signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/27/2025. Referred to Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Objections to F&R due within Thirty (30) Days. (Deputy Clerk SSA) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Thu 02/27 2:43 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:12 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), served on Juan Covarrubias Padilla. (Deputy Clerk SSA) |
||
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minute Order
Tue 02/25 8:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on February 25, 2025: Plaintiff Juan Covarrubias Padilla is proceeding pro se in this action and has requested leave to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (ECF No.2 ). Plaintiff has made the requisite showing required by § 1915(a). Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.2 ) is granted. (Text Only Entry) (Deputy Clerk FMN) |
|
service
Service by Mail
Tue 02/25 8:27 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL: 11 Minute Order, served on Juan Covarrubias Padilla. (Deputy Clerk FMN) |
||
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER of RECUSAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 02/21/2025. Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean for all further proceedings. The new case number is: 1:25-cv-00221-EPG. (Deputy Clerk CM) |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:25-cv-00083. |
|
8 | 8
![]() Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Eastern District of California, Fresno Division. Case transferred electronically to Eastern District of California on 2/20/2025. (JSR) |
|
7 | 7
![]() CLOSED TRANSFER to the Eastern District of California - Plaintiff filed this action in the Southern District of Indiana on January 14, 2025. Dkt.1 . The complaint is based on alleged events that took place in California, appearing to stem from an alleged incident that occurred in Stevinson, which is in the Eastern District of California. On January 15, this Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause why this case should not be transferred to the Eastern District of California. Dkt.6 . He has not responded to that order. Based on the foregoing, this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California, Fresno Division. (See Order.) Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 2/20/2025. Copy to Plaintiff via US mail. (JSR) |
|
misc
IFP Application
Thu 02/20 1:28 PM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Deputy Clerk OFR) |
||
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
4 | 4
![]() |
|
3 | 3
![]() |
|
2 | 2
![]() |
|
1 | 1
![]() |