Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Harvey E Schlesinger
Referred: Laura Lothman Lambert
Case #: 3:25-cv-00176
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Frank DeJesus, III
Defendant
ProTec Powder Coating, L.L.C.
Plaintiff
Carlos Torres Miranda
Represented By
Patrick Brooks LaRou
Fairlaw Firm
contact info
Brian H. Pollock
Fairlaw Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 03/31 3:55 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Frank DeJesus, III, AND ProTec Powder Coating, L.L.C. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/31/2025. (NK)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
13 13 motion Default - Clerks Entry of Default Fri 03/28 10:54 AM
Second MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against All Defendants by Carlos Torres Miranda.(Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Wed 03/26 12:38 PM
Endorsed Order denying without prejudice doc. 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Defendant, ProTec Powder Coating, LLC. Plaintiff cites the incorrect service of process documents and dates for Defendant ProTec Powder Coating LLC. Plaintiff may refile the motion with corrected information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert on 3/26/2025. (SS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/24 3:07 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Carlos Torres Miranda. (Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Default - Clerks Entry of Default Mon 03/24 2:49 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default against ProTec Powder Coating, L.L.C. by Carlos Torres Miranda.(Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Clerk's Default
Friday, March 07, 2025
9 9 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/07 1:53 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/4/2025 by Carlos Torres Miranda as to ProTec Powder Coating, L.L.C..(Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return of Service
Monday, March 03, 2025
8 8 service Summons returned executed Mon 03/03 5:07 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/1/2025 by Carlos Torres Miranda as to Frank DeJesus, III.(Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Return of Service
Thursday, February 27, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Thu 02/27 4:01 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Carlos Torres Miranda. Related case(s): Yes (Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 02/24 8:21 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (TPL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of appearance Fri 02/21 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Brooks LaRou on behalf of Carlos Torres Miranda (LaRou, Patrick)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons issued Fri 02/21 2:36 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Frank DeJesus, III, ProTec Powder Coating, L.L.C. (LSS)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/21 8:29 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Laura Lothman Lambert. New case number: 3:25-cv-176-HES-LLL. (ARL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Thu 02/20 5:22 PM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Brian H. Pollock on behalf of Carlos Torres Miranda. Lead Counsel: Brian H. Pollock, Esq.. (Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 4:54 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-23045057) filed by All Plaintiffs.(Pollock, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons ProTec,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Summons deJesus