Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00161
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:California Southern, 3:25-cv-00008
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
DOES 1-10
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Represented By
George John Gigounas
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN COMPANY
Represented By
George John Gigounas
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Represented By
George John Gigounas
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
SHAUNA DANENE PURRY
Represented By
DENNIS WEITZEL
Ted B Lyon & Associates - Mesquite Tx
contact info
Troy Brenes
Brenes Law Group
contact info
BEN C MARTIN
Ben Martin Law Group - Dallas Tx
contact info
CAIO FORMENTI
Ben Martin Law Group - Dallas Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/03 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DENNIS WEITZEL on behalf of SHAUNA DANENE PURRY (WEITZEL, DENNIS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 10:38 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CAIO FORMENTI on behalf of SHAUNA DANENE PURRY (FORMENTI, CAIO)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Docket Annotation Wed 03/26 8:06 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - Pursuant to ECF6 PTO NO. 4, in the lead case re-file the PHV motion in the lead case 3:25-md-3140 on behalf of NOTICE ONLY party. Re9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Wm. Arbon. (motion will be termiated) (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Docket Annotation Wed 03/26 8:01 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The referenced document was posted incorrectly and has been corrected by the clerk. The s/(name) signature on the document is incorrect and should be refiled with the appropriate attorney's signature (atty name). Alternatively, the attorney that signed the above documents should file an electronic "Notice of Appearance" to properly appear on behalf of the respective party. re:8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Notice of Appearance filed by SHAUNA DANENE PURRY. (motion will be terminated) (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/25 4:56 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Wm. Arbon.( Filing fee $ 219 receipt number AFLNDC-9415528.) by SHAUNA DANENE PURRY. (MARTIN, BEN)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Tue 03/25 4:53 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Notice of Appearance by SHAUNA DANENE PURRY. (MARTIN, BEN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:25-cv-00008. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
5 5 Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Florida*.*One North Palafox Street**Pensacola, FL 32502-5665* (rmc) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MDL 3140 CTO-1
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
4 4 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA granting3 Motion to Stay: Good cause appearing, the parties' joint motion is GRANTED and the instant action is STAYED until 3/14/2025 . No later than 3/14/2025 , the parties must file a joint status report informing the Court as to the status of the petition and whether the stay should be extended. (no document attached) (mjsn) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
3 3 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn, Pharmacia LLC. (Gigounas, George)Attorney George John Gigounas added to party Pfizer Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney George John Gigounas added to party Pharmacia & Upjohn(pty:dft), Attorney George John Gigounas added to party Pharmacia LLC(pty:dft) (maq). [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
2 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sjt) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 through 10, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn, Pharmacia LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19473627). Filed by Shauna Danene Purry. The new case number is 3:25-cv-8-AJB-AHG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Brenes, Troy)(sjt) [Transferred from California Southern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet