Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00164
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:25-cv-00799
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:30 AM EDT
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
SONYA BATES
505 East Arnaudo Boulevard, #912
Tracy, CA 95391
Represented By
ADAM JORGE GOMEZ
Grant & Eisenhofer Pa - Wilmington De
contact info
Mary Elizabeth Graham
Grant & Eisenhofer P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Thursday, February 20, 2025
11 11 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:25-cv-00799. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
10 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by the MDL Panel Transferring Case to the Northern District of Florida (MDL No. 3140). (gba, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Transferring case electronically to the Northern District of Florida. (gba, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
9 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/1/2025 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 4/24/2025. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 01/30/2025. (mbc, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
7 7 Summons Issued as to Greenstone, LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC, Pharmacia LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jaf, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2025 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (gba, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sonya Bates.. (Graham, Mary) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
3 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/6/2025. (as, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sonya Bates re1 Complaint, (Graham, Mary) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20268293.). Filed by Sonya Bates. (Graham, Mary) [Transferred from California Northern on 2/20/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Defendant Pfizer Inc.,
Att: 3 Summons Defendant Greenstone LLC,
Att: 4 Summons Defendant Pharmacia & Upjohn,
Att: 5 Summons Defendant Pharmacia LLC