New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Rachel P Kovner
Referred: Arlene R Lindsay
Case #: 2:25-cv-00974
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
Wakefern Food Corp.
Represented By
Michael W Castronovo
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard, & Smith
contact info
Defendant
Miguel F Vega
10 Lincoln Avenue
North Arlington,, NJ 07031
Represented By
Michael W Castronovo
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard, & Smith
contact info
Defendant
Vega Transportation, LLC
Represented By
Michael W Castronovo
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard, & Smith
contact info
Plaintiff
Orlando Santana Frias
Represented By
Adilya Rishatovna Gambone
Gambone Law Group, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 04/30 11:31 AM
ORDER granting14 : The time to File the Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement is extended to and including May 12, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/30/2025. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 04/29 1:04 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Orlando Santana Frias. (Kendrick, Jazmine)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/29 1:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jazmine M Kendrick on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kendrick, Jazmine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
order Order(Other) Wed 04/16 3:25 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file the required Rule 7.1 disclosure statement, because in this case, the alleged subject matter jurisdiction is based upon diversity of citizenship. Failure to file the required disclosure statement by April 30, 2025, may lead to sanctions or other appropriate remedies. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 4/16/2025. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
12 12 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 03/28 4:58 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order per Rule 26 by Miguel F Vega, Vega Transportation, LLC, Wakefern Food Corp. (Castronovo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
11 11 misc Jury Demand Mon 03/10 5:00 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Orlando Santana Frias (Gambone, Adilya)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adilya Rishatovna Gambone on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Gambone, Adilya)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/28 1:19 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by March 28, 2025. See the attached Order for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 2/28/2025. c/ecf (RI)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Rule 26(f) form
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Fri 02/21 10:16 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (LJ)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Fri 02/21 10:13 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (LJ)
Related: [-]
6 6 trial Exhibit Fri 02/21 10:02 AM
EXHIBIT 3017(c) response on damages by Miguel F Vega, Vega Transportation, LLC, Wakefern Food Corp.. Related document:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Vega Transportation, LLC, Wakefern Food Corp., Miguel F Vega. (Castronovo, Michael)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 02/21 10:16 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (LJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
5 5 misc Letter Thu 02/20 5:56 PM
Letter attaching exhibit D for notice of removal by Vega Transportation LLC, Wakefern Food Corp., miguel vega (Castronovo, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Jury Demand Thu 02/20 5:38 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vega Transportation LLC, Wakefern Food Corp., miguel vega (Castronovo, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 5:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vega Transportation LLC, Wakefern Food Corp., miguel vega (Castronovo, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/20 5:36 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Vega Transportation LLC, Wakefern Food Corp., miguel vega (Castronovo, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/20 5:34 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Supreme Court Nassau County, case number 622232/2024. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANYEDC-18784707) (Castronovo, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Defendants answer,
Att: 3 Exhibit C CPLR 3017(C) demand for damages