Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:25-cv-00258
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:100 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:03 AM CDT
Defendant
Bumble Inc.
Represented By
Noah C. Graubart
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Bumble Trading LLC
Represented By
Noah C. Graubart
Fish & Richardson, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Key Patent Innovations Ltd.
Represented By
Connor S. Houghton
Reichman Jorgensen Lehman & Feldberg LLP
contact info
Jolene Robin-Mccaskill
Reichman Jorgensen Lehman & Feldberg
contact info
Khue V. Hoang
Reichman Jorgensen Lehman & Feldberg LLP
contact info
Mark D. Siegmund
Cherry Johnson Siegmund James, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Malikie Innovations Ltd.
Represented By
Connor S. Houghton
Reichman Jorgensen Lehman & Feldberg LLP
contact info
Jolene Robin-Mccaskill
Reichman Jorgensen Lehman & Feldberg
contact info
Khue V. Hoang
Reichman Jorgensen Lehman & Feldberg LLP
contact info
Mark D. Siegmund
Cherry Johnson Siegmund James, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 04/30 2:48 PM
Text Order GRANTING18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to May 22, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (zelc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 05/01 4:23 PM
Reset Deadlines: Bumble Inc. answer due 5/22/2025; Bumble Trading LLC answer due 5/22/2025. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/29 9:11 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Bumble Inc., Bumble Trading LLC.(Graubart, Noah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/27 8:27 AM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jolene Robin-Mccaskill for Key Patent Innovations Ltd.,Jolene Robin-Mccaskill for Malikie Innovations Ltd.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 03/24 3:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malikie Innovations Ltd., Key Patent Innovations Ltd.. Bumble Inc. served on 3/19/2025, answer due 4/9/2025. (Siegmund, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/17 12:21 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark D. Siegmund on behalf of Jolene Robin-McCaskill ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19921969) by on behalf of Key Patent Innovations Ltd., Malikie Innovations Ltd..(Siegmund, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 13, 2025
14 14 notice Notice Thu 03/13 5:39 PM
NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Bumble Inc., Bumble Trading LLC re1 Complaint, (Graubart, Noah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/12 9:21 AM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Connor S. Houghton for Key Patent Innovations Ltd.,Connor S. Houghton for Malikie Innovations Ltd.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (pg)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (No Doc#) Tue 03/11 1:35 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albrights[LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings - Patent Cases] . (bot4)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/10 8:32 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Connor S. Houghton ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19895067) by on behalf of Key Patent Innovations Ltd., Malikie Innovations Ltd..(Houghton, Connor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 service Summons Issued Thu 03/06 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to Bumble Inc. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/04 4:01 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Key Patent Innovations Ltd., Malikie Innovations Ltd.. (Siegmund, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/03 11:53 AM
ORDER GRANTING8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Khue V. Hoang for Key Patent Innovations Ltd.,Khue V. Hoang for Malikie Innovations Ltd.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (pg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/28 6:29 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Khue V. Hoang ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19854545) by on behalf of Key Patent Innovations Ltd., Malikie Innovations Ltd..(Hoang, Khue)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/26 5:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malikie Innovations Ltd., Key Patent Innovations Ltd.. Bumble Trading LLC served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025. (Siegmund, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 02/26 5:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Malikie Innovations Ltd., Key Patent Innovations Ltd.. Bumble Inc. served on 2/24/2025, answer due 3/17/2025. (Siegmund, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 02/24 9:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Bumble Inc., Bumble Trading LLC. (kp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Thu 02/20 4:56 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Key Patent Innovations Ltd., Malikie Innovations Ltd. identifying Other Affiliate New PP Licensing LLC for Key Patent Innovations Ltd.. (Siegmund, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/20 4:47 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Key Patent Innovations Ltd., Malikie Innovations Ltd.. (Siegmund, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Thu 02/20 4:45 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Siegmund, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement and Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19818700), filed by Malikie Innovations Ltd., Key Patent Innovations Ltd..(Siegmund, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/24 9:05 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 02/24 9:05 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 02/24 9:06 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Key Patent Innovations Ltd., Malikie Innovations Ltd.. (kp)
Related: [-]