Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Byron B Conway
Case #: 1:25-cv-00256
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:43 AM CDT
Defendant
City of Watertown Wisconsin
Represented By
Amy J Doyle
Crivello Carlson Sc
contact info
Mary E Nelson
Crivello Carlson Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Riaha C Yanke
413 S 6th Street Apt A
Watertown, WI 53094
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dan Bartz
Terminated: 03/07/2025
Defendant
Dave Brower
Terminated: 03/07/2025
Defendant
John Doe
Terminated: 03/07/2025
Defendant
John/Jane Doe
Terminated: 03/07/2025
Defendant
Debbie Schuett
Terminated: 03/07/2025
Plaintiff
Thomas H L Barfell
Terminated: 03/07/2025
413 S 6th Street Apt A
Watertown, WI 53094


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
13 13 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Tue 04/15 9:56 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by City of Watertown Wisconsin. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.)(Doyle, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 24, 2025
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Mon 03/24 9:50 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re11 Notice of Appearance filed by City of Watertown Wisconsin; All documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (mav)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 03/21 2:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Watertown Wisconsin - Waiver sent on 3/10/2025.(Doyle, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy J Doyle on behalf of City of Watertown Wisconsin. Attorney(s) appearing: Mary E. Nelson (Doyle, Amy)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy J Doyle on behalf of City of Watertown Wisconsin. Attorney(s) appearing: Amy J. Doyle (Doyle, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 misc Transmit Complaint/Notice/Waiver Mon 03/10 9:54 AM
TRANSMIT Order8 , Complaint1 , Notice of Lawsuit, Waive of Service, and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge to USMS for service upon Defendant City of Watertown Wisconsin. (kwf)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 8 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Party Fri 03/07 12:45 PM
ORDER signed by District Judge Byron B Conway on 3/7/2025 GRANTING2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by Riaha C Yanke and3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee filed by Thomas H L Barfell. "Count 3: Violation of the Wisconsin Open Meetings Law" is DISMISSED. Thomas H. L. Barfell is DISMISSED as a plaintiff. Dan Bartz, Dave Brower, Debbie Schuett, and John / Jane Doe Officers are DISMISSED as defendants. The U.S. Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this order upon the defendant. (cc: all counsel and mailed to pro se parties) (Conway, Byron)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
7 7 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 03/05 3:20 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Riaha C Yanke. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (kwf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
6 6 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/26 3:28 PM
INCOMPLETE Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Riaha C Yanke. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Form mailed to Plaintiff Yanke to be completed) (jmk)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/26 3:22 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Thomas H L Barfell. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.)(jmk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 misc Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate Thu 02/20 3:49 PM
LETTER from the Clerk to Riaha C Yanke and Thomas H L Barfell re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (kwf)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Thu 02/20 3:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Thomas H L Barfell. (kwf)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Thu 02/20 3:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Riaha C Yanke. (kwf)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint - Pro Se Thu 02/20 3:22 PM
PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Riaha C Yanke and Thomas H L Barfell. (kwf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope