California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:25-cv-01837
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(a) - Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 2:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Catalin Barbacioru
an individual 36178 Potel Comm
Fremont, CA 94536
Represented By
Eric J. Amdursky
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David S. Almeling
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Megan K. Smith
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Natera, Inc.
a Delaware corporation 13011 McCallen Pass Building A, Suite 100
Austin, TX 78753
Represented By
Eric J. Amdursky
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David S. Almeling
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Megan K. Smith
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Defendant
Alan Selewa
an individual 846 Cotati Ter Unit 5
Sunnyvale, CA 94085
Represented By
Eric J. Amdursky
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
David S. Almeling
O'Melveny And Myers LLP
contact info
Megan K. Smith
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Guardant Health, Inc.
Delaware corporation 3100 Hanover St.
Palo Alto, CA 94304
Represented By
Akhil Sheth
Keller Anderle Scolnick LLP
contact info
Jay Phillip Barron
Keller Anderle Scolnick LLP
contact info
Chase A Scolnick
Keller Anderle Scolnick LLP
contact info
Jennifer Lynn Keller
Keller Anderle Scolnick LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 04/25 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Alan Selewa by Guardant Health, Inc. (Scolnick, Chase)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Fri 04/11 2:39 PM
STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Natera, Inc., Alan Selewa, Catalin Barbacioru. (Almeling, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
20 20 4 pgs misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 03/11 12:45 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer Under L.R. 6-1(a) filed by Natera, Inc., Alan Selewa, Catalin Barbacioru. (Almeling, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
19 19 2 pgs respm Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Tue 03/04 10:06 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Notice of Withdrawal of Plaintiff Guardant Health, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, and Order Permitting Expedited Discovery) (Scolnick, Chase)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
18 18 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 03/03 12:28 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING HEARING. The Court HEREBY VACATES 2 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING SET FOR 3/6/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 02, 2025
17 17 3 pgs misc Status Report Sun 03/02 2:44 PM
STATUS REPORT RE: Order 14 (Joint) by Natera, Inc., Alan Selewa, Catalin Barbacioru. (Almeling, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Thu 02/27 5:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Akhil Sheth on behalf of Guardant Health, Inc. (Sheth, Akhil)
Related: [-]
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/27 4:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING MOTION HEARING. Motion Hearing as to 2 Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, and Order Permitting Expedited Discovery set for 3/6/2025, at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor before Judge Edward M Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(vla, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Thu 02/27 4:12 PM
ORDER. The Court has received 2 Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and expedited discovery. Defendant is ordered to file a response to the motion by Monday, 3/3, at 9:00 a.m. The Court shall hear the motion on Thursday, 3/6, at 1:30 p.m. In the meantime, the parties are ordered to meet and confer _immediately_ to see if they can reach agreement on a temporary resolution that would allow for the Court to consider the issues raised in the motion on a non-emergency basis. To be clear, the Court sees no reason why the parties should not be able to reach a temporary resolution. The parties shall provide a joint status update on 3/3, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (emclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 02/26 9:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Megan K Smith on behalf of Natera, Inc., Alan Selewa, Catalin Barbacioru (Smith, Megan)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 02/26 9:18 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jay Phillip Barron on behalf of Guardant Health, Inc. (Barron, Jay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
11 11 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 02/25 8:51 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Natera, Inc., Alan Selewa, Catalin Barbacioru (Almeling, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 02/25 8:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by David S. Almeling on behalf of Natera, Inc., Alan Selewa, Catalin Barbacioru (Almeling, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 02/25 8:21 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Eric J. Amdursky on behalf of Natera, Inc., Alan Selewa, Catalin Barbacioru (Amdursky, Eric)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 02/25 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Jennifer Lynn Keller on behalf of Guardant Health, Inc. (Keller, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 02/21 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Catalin Barbacioru, Natera, Inc., Alan Selewa.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Fri 02/21 10:28 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Case Management Statement due by 5/20/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2025 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.(cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 02/21 9:01 AM
Case assigned to Judge Edward M Chen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 02/21 10:33 AM
*** DO NOT attach the proposed summons, or other pleadings that are not associated with the initiating document. Proposed summonses, should be e-filed separately using the appropriate events after you have filed your initiating document and attachments. ***[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached.Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:1 Complaint, filed by Guardant Health, Inc. (cv, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Thu 02/20 6:07 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Guardant Health, Inc... (Scolnick, Chase)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 02/20 6:05 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Guardant Health, Inc. (Scolnick, Chase)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Ex Parte Application Thu 02/20 5:41 PM
Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order, Order to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue, and Order Permitting Expedited Discovery filed by Guardant Health, Inc..(Scolnick, Chase)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Declaration of Stefanie Mortimer in Support of Guardant Health, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application,
Att: 2 3 pgs Declaration of Steven Mancini in Support of Guardant Health, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Steven Mancini,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Steven Mancini,
Att: 5 Declaration of Chase Scolnick in Support of Guardant Health, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application,
Att: 6 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Chase Scolnick,
Att: 7 Proposed Order Granting Guardant Health, Inc.'s Ex Parte Application
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 5:22 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-20373156.). Filed by Guardant Health, Inc..(Scolnick, Chase)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons to Natera, Inc.,
Att: 3 Summons to Alan Selewa,
Att: 4 Summons to Catalin Barbacioru