Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Referred: Anna W Howard
Case #: 1:25-cv-00875
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Fri 04/25 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Filing Reply Brief by Rickey Dashun Westbrook re6 Response to Habeas Petition (jbu)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
8 8 respm Response (Non-Motion) Thu 04/24 10:37 AM
Reply Brief to Respondent's6 Answer- RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rickey Dashun Westbrook.(tcc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Letter
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/22 11:46 AM
Submission of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,6 Response to Habeas Petition,, to Magistrate Judge Anna W. Howard. (clk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/01 2:41 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Anna W. Howard. Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:25-cv-875-VMC-AWH. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (dgr)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 04/01 2:45 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Rickey Dashun Westbrook re Case Assigned/Reassigned. (dgr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Fri 03/28 9:44 AM
NOTICE of Filing by Andrew McFarland(Brock, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Court decision affirming Petitioners convictions on February 28, 2020, in Westbrook v. State, 308 Ga. 92 (2020).,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 a copy of the record index prepared on appeal from Petitioners state habeas corpus case in Telfair County, No. 20-CH-016.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex 3 a copy of the record sent to the Georgia Supreme Court in Petitioners state habeas corpus case in Telfair County, No. 20-CH-016, which includes the original petition, numerous amendments, and 2 the final order denying relief.,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex 4, part 1 of 2 a copy of the transcript from Petitioners November 28, 2022, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing.,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex 4, part 2 of 2 a copy of the transcript from Petitioners November 28, 2022, state habeas corpus evidentiary hearing.,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex 5 a copy of Petitioners application for a certificate of probable cause to appeal filed on May 5, 2024.,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex 6 a copy of Petitioners brief in support of his application for a certificate of probable cause to appeal filed on June 3, 2024.,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex 7 a copy of the Supreme Court of Georgias order denying Petitioners application for a certificate of probable cause on January 14, 2025.,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex 8 a copy of the Supreme Court of Georgias remittitur issued on January 30, 2025.,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex 9 a copy of Petitioners brief filed on May 21, 2019, on direct appeal.
6 6 answer Response to Habeas Petition Fri 03/28 9:30 AM
Answer- RESPONSE to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Andrew McFarland.(Brock, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief in support of Answer-Response
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Hobbs Hill on behalf of Andrew McFarland (Hill, Meghan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/10 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Brock on behalf of Andrew McFarland (Brock, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order ruling on IFP Order Directing Clerk to Perfect Service of HC Petition Mon 03/03 2:40 PM
ORDER directing Clerk to perfect service of petition and order on respondent by certified mail, with copy to State Attorney General. Respondent is directed to show cause within 30 days of receipt of order why writ should not be granted. Petitioner's request to proceed IFP2 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller on 3/3/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/03 2:41 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Rickey Dashun Westbrook re3 Order (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 03/03 3:08 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Certified Mailing re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,3 Order. CMRR (AG): 91 7199 9991 7032 5719 1988. CMRR (Warden): 91 7199 9991 7032 5719 1995. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 02/20 2:11 PM
Submission of2 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account for IFP and Frivolity Review to Magistrate Judge J. Clay Fuller. (pdt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
2 2 misc Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account Thu 02/20 2:10 PM
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Rickey Dashun Westbrook. (pdt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 02/20 2:09 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Rickey Dashun Westbrook. (pdt)
Related: [-]