New York Northern District Court
Judge:Mae A D'Agostino
Referred: Paul J Evangelista
Case #: 1:25-cv-00220
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 05, 2025 6:07 AM EDT
Defendant
American Mile LLC
Represented By
Deborah A. Skakel
Blank Rome Llp - New York Office
contact info
Sedalia E. Jones-Kennelly
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC
Represented By
Deborah A. Skakel
Blank Rome Llp - New York Office
contact info
Sedalia E. Jones-Kennelly
Blank Rome, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Flach Crane and Rigging Co. Inc.
Represented By
Gregory J. Spaun
Welby, Brady & Greenblatt, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, April 17, 2025
18 18 misc Supplemental Admission documents Thu 04/17 8:32 AM
Supplemental Admission documents re:17 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice, [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] . {Submitted via MFT}(egr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
misc Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency Thu 04/17 4:25 PM
Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re:17 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Certificate of Good Standing that has been issued by a Court ; The corrected documents should be transmitted to the Court via MFT found on the Court's website https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/submitting-files-court-mft and labeled 'Supplemental Admission documents' . Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. Notice of Compliance Deadline 5/1/2025 (jel, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
misc Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency Thu 03/27 1:14 PM
Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re:17 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the applicant MUST provide the following required documents: Certificate of Good Standing and Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice; The corrected documents should be transmitted to the Court via MFT found on the Court's website https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/submitting-files-court-mft and labeled 'Supplemental Admission documents' . Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (jel, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
17 17 motion Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/27 9:55 AM
MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Todd Malynn Filing fee $100, receipt number 27MOJJJH [THIS DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND VIEWABLE BY COURT USERS ONLY] {Filed via MFT on 3/25/2025} Motions referred to Paul J. Evangelista. (egr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Letter Request Wed 03/12 2:54 PM
ORDER granting15 Letter Requesting an Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint: American Mile LLC answer due 5/26/2025; Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC answer due 5/26/2025. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/11/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The Initial Conference is set for 7/18/2025 @ 10:00 AM in Albany. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista on 3/12/2025. (tab)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Letter Request/Motion Wed 03/12 12:17 PM
Letter Motion from Sedalia E. Jones-Kennelly for American Mile LLC, Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC requesting Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino .(Jones-Kennelly, Sedalia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment - Proposed Stipulated Order Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint, etc.
Monday, March 10, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Mon 03/10 11:33 AM
Letter from Gregory J. Spaun re6 Letter of Admission Requirement as to Adam P. Briskin. (egr)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/28 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sedalia E. Jones-Kennelly on behalf of Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC, American Mile LLC (Jones-Kennelly, Sedalia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/25 3:05 PM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. American Mile LLC answer due 3/26/2025; Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC answer due 3/26/2025. Authorized by U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista on 2/25/2025. (tab)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
11 11 notice Notice - Other Mon 02/24 4:05 PM
NOTICE by Flach Crane and Rigging Co. Inc. re9 Affidavit Pursuant to Individual Practice Rule 3 (Spaun, Gregory)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice Regarding Judge D'Agostino Case Disposition Pilot (Text-Only) Mon 02/24 3:47 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf . (jel, )
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Affidavit Mon 02/24 2:42 PM
AFFIDAVIT /Declaration of Deborah A. Skakel, Esq. in Compliance with Rule 3 of the Individual Rules of Practice of Judge D'Agostino by Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC, American Mile LLC. (Skakel, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/21 5:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 State Court Complaint to March 26, 2025, filed by Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC, American Mile LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/14/2025 Motions referred to Paul J. Evangelista. (Skakel, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/21 11:25 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory J. Spaun on behalf of Flach Crane and Rigging Co. Inc. (Spaun, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Admission Requirement Thu 02/20 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Flach Crane and Rigging Co. Inc.; Attorney Adam Briskin, Email address is abriskin@wbgllp.com. Phone number is (914) 428-2100. Admissions due by 3/6/2025. (Copy of letter and GO.25 emailed to counsel.)(bas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/20 4:41 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah A. Skakel on behalf of Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC, American Mile LLC (Skakel, Deborah)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 02/20 4:32 PM
***Answer due date updated for American Mile LLC answer due 2/25/2025; Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC answer due 2/25/2025. (egr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
4 4 misc State Court Complaint Thu 02/20 4:31 PM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in NYS Supreme Court: County of Albany. (egr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Thu 02/20 4:28 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/19/2025 at 9:30 AM in Albany before U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul J. Evangelista. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 5/12/2025. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (egr)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 4:27 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Rustam Lomidve for American Mile LLC; Other Affiliate Phillip Or, Other Affiliate CMK Investments for Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC. (egr)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/20 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court: County of Albany, case number 912115-24 (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-7032732) filed by Big Truck & Equipment Sales, LLC.(egr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet