USA v. Aguirre-Aldana
Arizona District Court | |
Case #: | 4:25-cr-01080 |
Case Filed: | Feb 19, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Feb 21, 2025 12:21 AM MST |
Defendant
Edermisael Aguirre-Aldana (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/21/2025 1:24 AM MST |
Friday, January 24, 2025 | ||
Arrest of Edermisael Aguirre-Aldana on 1/24/2025. (JAM) [4:25-mj-04484-N/A-JR] | ||
Monday, January 27, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
2 | 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera: Initial Appearance as to Edermisael Aguirre-Aldana held on 1/28/2025. Government's motion for detention and request for continuance of the Detention Hearing is granted. Defendant(s) temporarily detained in the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Spanish Interpreter required. An attorney is appointed to represent the defendant. In the presence of government and defense counsel, the Court orally advises the government of their Brady obligation. Written order to follow. Appearances : AUSA Caroline Allen, duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Ruben Teram, duty for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Tania Sadler assists defendant. Detention Hearing set for 1/30/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri. Preliminary Hearing set for 1/30/2025 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri. Hearing held 2:14 PM to 2:46 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CXE) [4:25-mj-04484-N/A-JR] | |
3 | 3 ORDER: Under federal law, including Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and all applicable decisions from the Supreme Court and the Ninth Circuit interpreting Brady , the government has a continuing obligation to produce all information or evidence known to the government relating to guilt or punishment that might reasonably be considered favorable to the defendant's case, even if the evidence is not admissible so long as it is reasonably likely to lead to admissible evidence. See United States v. Price , 566 F.3d 900,913 n.14 (9th Cir. 2009). Accordingly, the court orders the government to produce to the defendant in a timely manner all such information or evidence. Information or evidence may be favorable to a defendant's case if it either may help bolster the defendant's case or impeach a prosecutor's witness or other government evidence. If doubt exists, it should be resolved in favor of the defendant with full disclosure being made. If the government believes that a required disclosure would compromise witness safety, victim rights, national security, a sensitive law-enforcement technique, or any other substantial government interest, the government may apply to the Court for a modification of the requirements of this Disclosure Order, which may include in camera review and/or withholding or subjecting to a protective order all or part of the information. This Disclosure Order is entered under Rule 5(f) and does not relieve any party in this matter of any other discovery obligation. The consequences for violating either this Disclosure Order or the government's obligations under Brady include, but are not limited to, the following: contempt, sanction, referral to a disciplinary authority, adverse jury instruction, exclusion of evidence, and dismissal of charges. Nothing in this Disclosure Order enlarges or diminishes the government's obligation to disclose information and evidence to a defendant under Brady , as interpreted and applied under Supreme Court and Ninth Circuit precedent. As the Supreme Court noted, "the government violates the Constitution's Due Process Clause 'if it withholds evidence that is favorable to the defense and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment." ' Turner v. United States , 137 S. Ct. 1885, 1888 (2017), quoting Smith v. Cain , 565 U.S. 73, 75 (2012). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Maria S Aguilera.(CXE)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [4:25-mj-04484-N/A-JR] | |
5 | 5 MINUTE ORDER: Added appointed attorney Patrick Manuel Doyle, CJA for Edermisael Aguirre-Aldana. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (AFA) [4:25-mj-04484-N/A-JR] | |
Thursday, January 30, 2025 | ||
6 | 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri: Detention Hearing as to Edermisael Aguirre-Aldana held on 1/30/2025. Defendant ordered detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing as to defendant waived on 1/30/2025. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Appearances : AUSA Lori Price, duty for the Government, CJA Attorney Patrick Manuel Doyle for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Yvette Citizen assists defendant. Hearing held 10:52 AM to 10:55 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) [4:25-mj-04484-N/A-JR] | |
7 | 7 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Edermisael Aguirre-Aldana. I conclude that the following facts require the detention of the defendant pending trial in this case. Findings of Fact and Statement of Reasons: (1) There is probable cause to believe that the defendant has committed an offense. (2) There is a serious risk that the defendant will not appear. (3) Defendant is a citizen of another country, illegally in the United States of America. (4) Defendant does not have sufficient ties to the community. (5) The reports from Pretrial Services Agency are adopted as the further findings of this Magistrate Judge. Directions Regarding Detention: The defendant is committed to the custody of the Attorney General or his/her designated representative for confinement in a corrections facility separate, to the extent practicable, from persons awaiting or serving sentences or being held in custody pending appeal. The defendant shall be afforded a reasonable opportunity for private consultation with defense counsel. On order of a court of the United States or on request of an attorney for the Government, the person in charge of the corrections facility shall deliver the defendant to the United States Marshal for the purpose of an appearance in connection with a court proceeding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A Ambri on 1/30/2025. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB) [4:25-mj-04484-N/A-JR] | |
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9
![]() |