California Central District Court
Judge:Michelle Williams Court
Referred: John D Early
Case #: 2:25-cv-01471
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1338 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 2:59 AM PDT
Defendant
Marvin Cifuentes
Defendant
Eliseo Edemir Flores
Defendant
Sarkis Grigoryan
Defendant
Number One Collision LLC
Defendant
Number One Customs LLC
Plaintiff
RDB LA Group, Inc.
Represented By
Nicholas S. Lee
Dickinson Wright
contact info
Francis S Ryu
Ryu Law Firm
contact info
John L Krieger
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
49 49 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Thu 05/15 10:06 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Sarkis Grigoryan (yl)
Related: [-]
48 48 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Thu 05/15 9:27 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Eliseo Edemir Flores (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
47 47 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 05/14 1:16 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion for default judgment or other appropriate dispositive motion filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
46 46 motion Clerk to Enter Default Wed 05/14 12:52 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Sarkis Grigoryan filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of John L. Krieger
45 45 motion Clerk to Enter Default Wed 05/14 12:43 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Eliseo Edemir Flores filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of John L. Krieger
Monday, May 12, 2025
44 44 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/12 5:02 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AS TO SARKIS GRIGORYAN by Judge Michelle Williams Court. The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than May 19, 2025, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution regarding overdue responses as to Sarkis Grigoryan. Pursuant to Rule 55 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff shall file an application requesting the entry of default. Plaintiff is advised that the Court will consider the filing of an amended application, which complies with the federal rules, on or before the date upon which the response is due, as a satisfactory response to the Order to Show Cause. The Order to Show Cause will stand submitted upon the filing of an appropriate response. No oral argument will be heard unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Failure to respond will result in the dismissal of this matter. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
43 43 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Tue 05/06 8:27 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Number One Customs LLC. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
42 42 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Mon 04/28 1:21 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Number One Collision LLC. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
41 41 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/24 2:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc., upon Defendant Eliseo Edemir Flores served on 4/21/2025, answer due 5/12/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Eliseo Edemir Flores in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Ryu, Francis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
40 40 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 04/16 10:47 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFAULT OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS NUMBER ONE CUSTOMS, LLC and MARVIN CIFUENTES by Judge Michelle Williams Court. Default by clerk was entered on April 11, 2025 and April 14, 2025. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a motion for default judgment or, other appropriate dispositive motion on or before May 14, 2025. Plaintiff may file the motion and set it for hearing on an earlier date so long as the date is available on the Courts Open Motion Calendar. Failure to file said dispositive motion by May 14, 2025 will result in dismissal without further notice by the Court. (yl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
39 39 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Mon 04/14 2:44 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Marvin Cifuentes (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
38 38 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 04/11 1:24 PM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Number One Customs, LLC (yl)
Related: [-]
37 37 notice Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form Fri 04/11 12:01 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Regarding: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Marvin Cifuentes35 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: No declaration of due diligence. A new request for entry of default must be re-submitted. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
36 36 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 04/10 2:56 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Number One Customs LLC filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of John L. Krieger
35 35 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 04/10 2:47 PM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Marvin Cifuentes filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of John L. Krieger
Monday, April 07, 2025
34 34 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 04/08 3:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION AS TO MARVIN CIFUENTES AND NUMBER ONE CUSTOMS, LLC by Judge Michelle Williams Court: The Court, on its own motion, orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than April 14, 2025, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution regarding overdue responses as to Marvin Cifuentes and Number One Customs LLC. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
33 33 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 04/04 1:55 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Sarkis Grigoryan answer now due 5/9/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc..(Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
32 32 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 04/04 9:40 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc., upon Defendant Sarkis Grigoryan served on 3/28/2025, answer due 4/18/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarkis Grigoryan in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
31 31 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 04/03 3:01 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Number One Collision LLC answer now due 4/28/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc..(Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/03 2:51 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc., upon Defendant Number One Collision LLC served on 3/7/2025, answer due 3/28/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Doe - Front Desk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
29 29 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/03 2:47 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc., upon Defendant Number One Customs LLC served on 3/7/2025, answer due 3/28/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Doe - Front Desk in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 04/03 2:44 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc., upon Defendant Marvin Cifuentes served on 3/7/2025, answer due 3/28/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe, Co-occupant of Defendant Marvin Cifuentes in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
27 27 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 3:28 PM
ORDER by Judge Michelle Williams Court: granting26 Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas S. Lee APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc., designating Francis S. Ryu as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
26 26 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 03/21 5:49 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas S. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/13/2025, Receipt No. 39293803) filed by plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Ryu, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 20, 2025
25 25 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 03/20 2:34 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Corrected Application of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas S. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.22 by Judge Michelle Williams Court: The document is STRICKEN. Counsel shall cure the deficiencies as noted in Dkt. no.24 ). Counsel shall take note that all filings must be submitted in legible format. (tj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Wed 03/19 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas S. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/13/2025, Receipt No. 39293803)22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (sbou)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 03/19 7:14 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Application of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas S. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.18 by Judge Michelle Williams Court: The document is STRICKEN. (tj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Tue 03/18 6:08 PM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas S. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/13/2025, Receipt No. 39293803) filed by plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Ryu, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Tue 03/18 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas S. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39293803)18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Application not signed by local counsel. (sbou)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 03/14 9:11 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Dkt. 16 ) by Judge Michelle Williams Court: Based on the filing of Plaintiff's Response to the Order to Show Cause (Dkt.19 ) filed on March 13, 2025, the Order to Show Cause issued on March 6, 2025, is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
19 19 misc Response Thu 03/13 4:10 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.to Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 16 (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 03/13 1:41 PM
First APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas S. Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-39293803) filed by plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Ryu, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/13 1:01 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis S Ryu counsel for Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. Adding Francis S. Ryu as counsel of record for RDB LA Group, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc. (Attorney Francis S Ryu added to party RDB LA Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Ryu, Francis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
16 16 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 03/06 3:14 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE FAILURE TO ADHERE TO NOTICE (DKT.14 ) by Judge Michelle Williams Court: This action was filed on February 20, 2025. The Court issued a Notice of Pro Hac Vice Application Due on February 25, 2025, directing Plaintiff to file a pro hac vice application for non-resident attorney Nicholas S. Lee or return the notice stating why Mr. Lee is not required to file a pro hac application. The application was to be filed by March 4, 2025. Plaintiff has failed to file the application. Accordingly, the Court issues an Order to Show Cause for Plaintiff's failure to follow the Local Rules and Notice. Plaintiff shall file a declaration under penalty of perjury by March 13, 2025, explaining the reason for the non-compliance. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
15 15 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 02/25 12:20 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 as to Defendants Marvin Cifuentes, Eliseo Edemir Flores, Sarkis Grigoryan, Number One Collision LLC, Number One Customs LLC. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MCifuentes,
Att: 2 NumberOneCustomsLLC,
Att: 3 NumberOneCollision,
Att: 4 SGrigoryan
14 14 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Tue 02/25 12:11 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas S. Lee. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 02/25 7:23 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Michelle Williams Court. (ji)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 02/24 4:31 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
11 11 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 02/24 4:31 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 02/24 4:30 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michelle Williams Court and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 notice Summons Request Fri 02/21 11:31 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Summons Request Fri 02/21 11:30 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Summons Request Fri 02/21 11:29 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Summons Request Fri 02/21 11:28 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Summons Request Fri 02/21 11:27 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/20 6:24 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT of Plaintiff filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Thu 02/20 6:22 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 02/20 6:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 02/20 6:18 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39147093 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff RDB LA Group, Inc.. (Attorney John L Krieger added to party RDB LA Group, Inc.(pty:pla))(Krieger, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - A true and correct copy of text messages,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - A true and correct copy of October 23, 2024 letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - A true and correct copy of workers compensation claim,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - A true and correct copy of Reg. No. 6,083,907,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - A true and correct copy of Reg. No. 6,083,910