California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:25-cv-00383
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Monday Feb 24, 2025 1:01 AM PST
Defendant
Zelunette McKellar
Defendant
Kito Yslava
Defendant
Rodney Woodson
Defendant
Mark Woodrow Wilson
Defendant
Binh Tran
Defendant
Samantha Michelle Taylor
Defendant
John Jacko Romero
Defendant
Oakland Police Department
Defendant
Janey Lorraine Meeks-Hay
Defendant
Christopher Kelley
Defendant
Karlana Ingram
Defendant
Estate of Moses Jacko Jr.
Defendant
Gordon Dorham
Defendant
Victoria Lynn Denardi
Defendant
Chablis DeLove
Defendant
City Of Oakland
Represented By
Lorena Matei
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
Omar Ashford
Plaintiff
LaJuana A. Reid
7839 Lockwood Street
Oakland, CA 94621

GPO Jan 22 2025
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 7 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2025)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
oth_evt ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/12 10:34 AM
Set Deadline/Hearing re: ECF No. 43 ORDER. Case Management Statements due by 7/29/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 08/04/2025 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 11, 2025
43 43 order Order Sun 05/11 2:40 PM
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE In light of the pending motions, the case management conference scheduled for May 13, 2025, is CONTINUED to August 5, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. Updated case management statements are due July 29, 2025. Plaintiff is admonished that she must file a case management statement pursuant to Civil Local Rule 16-9 and this order. Defendant is admonished that it must comply in all respects with Local Rule 16-9 even if Plaintiff does not do so. This means, inter alia, ensuring that its statement addresses all of the topics set forth in the Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California Contents of Joint Case Management Statement. The statement submitted on May 2, 2025, did not comply with these requirements. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Tigar, Jon) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
42 42 misc Case Management Statement Fri 05/02 1:37 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT DEFENDANT'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by City Of Oakland. (Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-]
41 41 respoth Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 05/02 3:25 AM
REPLY Related [+] Support of TAC by LaJuana A. Reid. Modified on 5/2/2025. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-] 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct re11 Amended Complaint Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint Pursuant F.R.C.P. 15(a)(2)id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Exhibit 33: Detailed Handwriting Analysis,
Att: 2 Exhibit 34: Admission by Silence,
Att: 3 Exhibit 35: FOIA Request Jan-2020 thru Jan 2025,
Att: 4 Exhibit 36: OPD not Erroneous,
Att: 5 Exhibit 37: SAC Coversheet and Page 14,
Att: 6 Exhibit 38: OPD Radio Traffic and Defamation by Dispatchers,
Att: 7 Exhibit 39: M. Patricia Fisher email exchange,
Att: 8 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice - EXHIBIT 1 thru 39
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 05/02 10:51 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re:41 Answer to Amended Complaint, filed by LaJuana A. Reid (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
40 40 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 04/25 12:12 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLAND'S OPPOSITIKON TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed byCity Of Oakland. (Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-] 36 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct11 Amended Complaint
Friday, April 18, 2025
39 39 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 04/18 2:19 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byCity Of Oakland. (Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-] 30 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLANDS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 12(b)(1),(6) AND 12(e); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES
Monday, April 14, 2025
38 38 misc Case Management Statement Mon 04/14 5:38 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PLAINTIFF INDIVDUAL STATEMENT filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Supplement Request for Court Appointed Mediator
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 04/14 10:49 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. For future filings, please be sure to select the ECF event that most closely aligns with the title of the document being filed. An index for all available ECF events can be located at the court's website at: https://cand.uscourts.gov/cases-e-filing/cm-ecf/e-filing-my-documents /index-of-ecf-events/ *** Re:37 Supplemental Brief filed by LaJuana A. Reid (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
37 37 oth_sup Supplemental Brief Fri 04/11 9:29 PM
Supplemental Brief re36 Third MOTION to Amend/Correct11 Amended Complaint filed byLaJuana A. Reid. Related [+]
Related: [-] 36 id, LaJuana
36 36 motion Amend/Correct Fri 04/11 9:03 PM
Third MOTION to Amend/Correct11 Amended Complaint filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Responses due by 4/25/2025. Replies due by 5/2/2025. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Supplement Third Amended Complaint (TAC),
Att: 2 Exhibit 31: Officer John Jacko Romero, acting in his Individual Capacity outside the scope of his duties. Targeting Plaintiff and misc.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 32: Officer John Jacko Romero, Created His Own Command Targeting Center within OPD.,
Att: 4 Declaration Plaintiffs Request for Judicial Notice - Exhibit 1 - 32
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 04/11 9:57 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re:35 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by LaJuana A. Reid (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
35 35 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Thu 04/10 8:40 PM
Request for Judicial Notice OPPOSITION filed byLaJuana A. Reid. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Exhibit 3: Revised App for Late Claim to City 6/16/24,
Att: 2 Exhibit 4: City Denial of Late Claim App 7/10/24,
Att: 3 Exhibit 5: Original Gov Claim Filed with City 5/29/24
34 34 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Thu 04/10 8:29 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed byLaJuana A. Reid.
Related: [-] 30 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLANDS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 12(b)(1),(6) AND 12(e); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Proposed Order DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
oth_evt ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/02 9:14 AM
Set Hearing re ECF No.33 Re-Notice as to30 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLANDS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 12(b)(1),(6) AND 12(e); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES . Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 06/04/2025 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
33 33 oth_sup Re-notice motion Tue 04/01 4:04 PM
Renotice motion hearing re30 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLANDS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 12(b)(1),(6) AND 12(e); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byCity Of Oakland. Related [+] (Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-] 30
Monday, March 31, 2025
32 32 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 03/31 10:28 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION HEARING. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice NOT re-file30 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLANDS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 12(b)(1),(6) AND 12(e); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by City Of Oakland. Hearing date of May 15, 2025 at 2:00PM is VACATED due to the date being listed as unavailable to further settings on Judge Tigar's calendar. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Judge's webpage and scheduling notes on the Court's website regarding scheduling before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
31 31 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Fri 03/28 5:25 PM
Request for Judicial Notice re30 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLANDS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 12(b)(1),(6) AND 12(e); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed byCity Of Oakland. Related [+] (Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-] 30
Att: 1 Exhibit
30 30 24 pgs motion Dismiss Fri 03/28 5:22 PM
MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT CITY OF OAKLANDS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P 12(b)(1),(6) AND 12(e); MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by City Of Oakland. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 5/15/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. Responses due by 4/11/2025. Replies due by 4/18/2025.(Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF LORENA MATEI IN SUPPORT OF THE CITY OF OAKLANDS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 03/03 9:37 AM
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar re 19 First MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Motion for Default Judgment filed by LaJuana A. Reid and 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City Of Oakland. Response due by 3/28/2025. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
28 28 oth_sup Re-notice motion Thu 02/27 10:42 AM
Renotice motion hearing re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCity Of Oakland. Related [+] (Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-] 15
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/27 11:29 AM
Set Hearing as to15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City Of Oakland. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only before Judge Jon S. Tigar. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of all counsel appearing for all parties should be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 05/14/2025 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
27 27 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Tue 02/25 10:36 AM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Supplemental Opposition Response filed byLaJuana A. Reid.
Related: [-] 15 MOTION to Dismiss id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Exhibit 12: Motive Illegal Cannabis Operation,
Att: 2 Exhibit 13: False CCR version 1 - written by OPD J. Romoero,
Att: 3 Exhibit 14: False CCR version 2 - written by OPD J. Romero,
Att: 4 Exhibit 15: False CCR version 3 - written by OPD J. Romero,
Att: 5 Exhibit 16: Incident Report Number Issued False CCR v 1,
Att: 6 Exhibit 17: Plaintiff's Activities 8/15/19,
Att: 7 Exhibit 18: False TRO written by Officer Romero,
Att: 8 Exhibit 19: Proof of Service to Legitimize Kidnapping,
Att: 9 Exhibit 20: RP Card written by OPD J. Romero ordering Plaintiff's kidnapping,
Att: 10 Exhibit 21: OPD J. Romero - Doc Loop written by OPD J. Romero to Justify Plaintiff's Kidnapping,
Att: 11 Exhibit 22: OPD Wilson and Denardi Admit to statcking the "Deck" for PC,
Att: 12 Exhibit 23: Proof Jacko did not know Plaintiff's name when Romero wrote CCR,
Att: 13 Exhibit 24: OPD J. Romero coaching on false 911 call,
Att: 14 Exhibit 25. OPD G. Dorham, fake IA investigation to cover for Romero,
Att: 15 Exhibit 26: Defamation: Dispatchers Leading Questions,
Att: 16 Exhibit 27: 2 Yr Civil RO and 2 Yr CPO against OPD J. Romero's cousin to protect Plaintiff,
Att: 17 Exhibit 28: Jacko Romero Family proof and Documents written by Officer Romero against Plaintiff,
Att: 18 Exhibit 29: Court Order allowing me into my home, despite Jacko TRO being denied.,
Att: 19 Exhibit 30: Malicious Prosection
Monday, February 24, 2025
26 26 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Mon 02/24 8:41 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Opposition to MTD filed byLaJuana A. Reid.
Related: [-] 15 MOTION to Dismiss id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Exhibit 10. SOL Time Barred,
Att: 2 Exhibit 11. Detailed Rebuttal Table:
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 02/24 11:27 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING24 RENOTICE MOTION HEARING. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice NOT re-file15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City Of Oakland. Hearing date of March 13, 2025, is vacated due to the date being listed as unavailable to further settings on Judge Tigar's calendar. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Judge's webpage and scheduling notes on the Court's website regarding scheduling before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
24 24 oth_sup Re-notice motion Mon 02/24 9:29 AM
Renotice motion hearing re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed byCity Of Oakland. Related [+] (Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-] 15
Thursday, February 20, 2025
23 23 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Thu 02/20 11:43 AM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ZOOM HEARING. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2025 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jst] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jstcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 05/12/2025 at 2:00PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (dms, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Declination of Default Thu 02/20 11:03 AM
Clerk's Notice DECLINATION OF DEFAULT as to defendant City of Oakland and all other named defendants. Related [+](krp, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-] (s)18
21 21 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 02/20 10:39 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] .. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/2025.(ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Thu 02/20 7:45 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re:18 First MOTION for Default Judgment by the Clerk as to Request Entry of Default filed by LaJuana A. Reid (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 15, 2025
19 19 First MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendant City of Oakland and all other named Defendants filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Motion for Default Judgment Hearing set for 3/13/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Responses due by 3/3/2025. Replies due by 3/10/2025. Related [+] Modified text on 2/18/2025 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Exhibit 7: Watchlist #9596690-00,
Att: 2 Exhibit 8: FOIA 24-2908
18 18 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant City of Oakland and all other named Defendants filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Related [+] Modified on 2/18/2025. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Exhibit 6: Court Docket
Thursday, February 13, 2025
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary.*** Re:17 Reply to Opposition/Response filed by LaJuana A. Reid (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
17 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] Opposition filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Modified on 2/13/2025. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] 15 MOTION to Dismiss id, LaJuana
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 5
16 16 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: All named Defendants who have not already done so shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/19/2025. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City Of Oakland. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 3/13/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. Responses due by 2/26/2025. Replies due by 3/5/2025.(Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
14 14 Request for Judicial Notice filed byCity Of Oakland.(Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
13 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by City Of Oakland.. (Matei, Lorena)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
12 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LaJuana A. Reid. City Of Oakland served on 1/22/2025, answer due 2/12/2025. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
11 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Related [+] Modified text on 1/23/2025 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety, using event Summons Returned Executed. Within ECF, select: Civil Events > Initial Pleadings and Service > Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed . When prompted, select the applicable party(ies) served and enter the date(s) of service.*** Re:10 Affidavit of Service filed by LaJuana A. Reid (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
10 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service Justin Whitworth served on City Attorney Office/ Loretha Oliver on 1/22/2025, filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Related [+]
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
9 9 ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 7 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall file her Second Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***NOTICE TO FILER: Incorrect event used. [err101] Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. For future filings, please be sure to select the ECF event that most closely corresponds to the title of the document being filed. An index for all available ECF events can be located at the court's website at: https://cand.uscourts.gov/cases-e-filing/cm-ecf/e-filing-my-documents/index-of-ecf-events/ *** Re:7 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct5 Amended Complaint, filed by LaJuana A. Reid,8 MOTION to Amend/Correct5 Amended Complaint, filed by LaJuana A. Reid (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
8 8 ERRATA to Page 28 re5 Amended Complaint, filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Responses due by 2/4/2025. Replies due by 2/11/2025. Related [+] Modified on 1/22/2025. Incorrect event (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
7 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct5 Amended Complaint, Amendment to Defendants' Section filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Responses due by 2/4/2025. Replies due by 2/11/2025. Related [+] Modified text on 1/22/2025 to conform to filing (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-] id, LaJuana
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
6 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by LaJuana A. Reid. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Omar Ashford, City Of Oakland, Chablis DeLove, Victoria Lynn Denardi, Gordon Dorham, Estate of Moses Jacko Jr., Karlana Ingram, Christopher Kelley, Zelunette McKellar, Janey Lorraine Meeks-Hay, John Jacko Romero, Samantha Michelle Taylor, Binh Tran, Mark Woodrow Wilson, Rodney Woodson, Kito Yslava. Filed by LaJuana A. Reid. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
4 4 NOTICE REGARDING RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 01/10/2025. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (krp, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 1/13/2025 (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued as to Omar Ashford, City Of Oakland, Chablis DeLove, Victoria Lynn Denardi, Gordon Dorham, Estate of Moses Jacko Jr., Karlana Ingram, Zelunette McKellar, Janey Lorraine Meeks-Hay, John Jacko Romero, Samantha Michelle Taylor, Binh Tran, Mark Woodrow Wilson, Rodney Woodson, Kito Yslava. (krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 113 pgs COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights and Damages against Omar Ashford, City Of Oakland, Chablis DeLove, Victoria Lynn Denardi, Gordon Dorham, Estate of Moses Jacko Jr., Karlana Ingram, Christopher Kelley, Zelunette McKellar, Janey Lorraine Meeks-Hay, John Jacko Romero, Samantha Michelle Taylor, Binh Tran, Mark Woodrow Wilson, Rodney Woodson, Kito Yslava (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt number 411018367). Filed by LaJuana A. Reid. Consent/Declination due by 1/24/2025.(krp, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt for Civil Filing Fee,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet