Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:25-cv-00169
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Case in other court:California Central, 2:25-cv-00324
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:05 AM EDT
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
PFIZER INC
Represented By
George John Gigounas
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Matthew A Holian
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Defendant
PHARMACIA AND UPJOHN COMPANY LLC
Represented By
George John Gigounas
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Matthew A Holian
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
Represented By
George John Gigounas
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
Matthew A Holian
Dla Piper Llp Us
contact info
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
Plaintiff
GERALDLYN SAM
Represented By
THOMAS ARBON
Ben Martin Law Group - Dallas Tx
contact info
BEN C MARTIN
Ben Martin Law Group - Dallas Tx
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, April 03, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/03 1:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS ARBON on behalf of GERALDLYN SAM (ARBON, THOMAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
20 20 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:25-cv-00324. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
19 19 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3140, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
18 18 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION17 TO STAY ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This action shall be stayed through 3/14/2025 or until the JPML decides the Petition, whichever is later. On 3/14/2025, if this action is not transferred to an MDL proceeding, the Parties shall file a joint status update. If the Petition is denied, Defendants shall have through and until 21 days after 3/14/2025 to respond to the Complaint. (vdr) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
17 17 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by Defendants Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia and Upjohn, Pharmacia LLC.(Attorney George John Gigounas added to party Pfizer, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney George John Gigounas added to party Pharmacia and Upjohn(pty:dft), Attorney George John Gigounas added to party Pharmacia LLC(pty:dft))(Gigounas, George) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
16 16 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Ben C. Martin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff Geraldlyn Sam, designating Troy Brenes as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (ak) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
15 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ben C. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Geraldlyn Sam (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38954552) filed by Plaintiff Geraldlyn Sam. (Brenes, Troy) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
14 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
13 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Pharmacia LLC. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Pharmacia and Upjohn. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
11 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Pfizer, Inc. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
10 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,8 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Geraldlyn Sam.(Brenes, Troy) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Pharmacia & Upjohn,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Pharmacia LLC
9 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ben C. Martin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request4 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
7 7 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
4 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Geraldlyn Sam. (Brenes, Troy) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Geraldlyn Sam, (Brenes, Troy) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Geraldlyn Sam. (Brenes, Troy) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38899596 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Geraldlyn Sam. (Attorney Troy A. Brenes added to party Geraldlyn Sam(pty:pla))(Brenes, Troy) [Transferred from California Central on 2/21/2025.]
Related: [-]