Texas Western District Court
Judge:Jason K Pulliam
Referred: Elizabeth S Chestney
Case #: 5:25-cv-00192
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Elmer's Home Services, LLC
Represented By
Jessica Glatzer Mason
Foley & Lardner LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric N Lopez
Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated Moore & Associates 440 LOUISIANA ST STE 1110
HOUSTON, TX 77002
Represented By
Curt Hesse
Moore & Associates
contact info
Melissa Moore
Moore & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Alberto Valle
Individually and On Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated Moore & Associates 440 LOUISIANA ST STE 1110
HOUSTON, TX 77002
Represented By
Curt Hesse
Moore & Associates
contact info
Melissa Moore
Moore & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Lozada Lazo
Represented By
Curt Hesse
Moore & Associates
contact info
Melissa Moore
Moore & Associates
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Membreno
Represented By
Melissa Moore
Moore & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
22 22 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/30 4:14 PM
PHASE I SCHEDULING ORDER: ADR Report Deadline due by 10/3/2025, Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2025, Discovery due by 7/28/2025,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (mgr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/30 12:33 PM
Text Order GRANTING20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/29 1:30 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jessica Glatzer Mason for McKenzie Ahmet ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-20111534) by on behalf of Elmer's Home Services, LLC.. Motions referred to Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (Mason, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 04/29 2:01 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/28/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Zoom.)(vl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
19 19 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Wed 04/23 4:42 PM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan and Joint Proposed Scheduling Order by Daniel Lozada Lazo, Eric N Lopez, Jose Membreno, Alberto Valle.(Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
18 18 misc Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge Wed 04/23 4:39 PM
CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Daniel Lozada Lazo, Eric N Lopez, Jose Membreno, Alberto Valle. (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
17 17 notice Notice Thu 04/10 5:46 PM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff - Carlos Ortiz by Alberto Valle re1 Complaint (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
16 16 4 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting Initial Pretrial Conference Mon 04/07 3:05 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Pretrial Conference Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2025 3:30 PM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney,. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (vl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
15 15 misc Certificate of Interested Parties Mon 03/31 5:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties by Daniel Lozada Lazo, Eric N Lopez, Jose Membreno, Alberto Valle. (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 03/31 2:57 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Elmer's Home Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Cascade Residential Services LLC for Elmer's Home Services, LLC. (Mason, Jessica)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/31 2:48 PM
Elmer's Home Services LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint (Original) . Attorney Jessica Glatzer Mason added to party Elmer's Home Services, LLC(pty:dft) by Elmer's Home Services, LLC.(Mason, Jessica)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice Mon 03/31 1:12 PM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff - Daniel Lozado Lazo by Alberto Valle re1 Complaint (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 service Certificate of Service Tue 03/18 11:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric N Lopez, Jose Membreno, Alberto Valle Elmer's Home Services, LLC served on 3/10/2025, answer due 3/31/20251 Complaint (Moore, Melissa) Modified on 3/18/2025 to edit text (rqr)
Related: [-]
service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/18 2:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alberto Valle, Jose Membreno, Eric N Lopez. Elmer's Home Services, LLC served on 3/10/2025, answer due 3/31/2025. (rqr)
Related: [-]
utility Notice of Correction Tue 03/18 2:22 PM
Notice of Correction: Entry was edited to reflect correct title of document re11 Certificate of Service. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
10 10 service Summons Issued Thu 03/06 3:55 PM
Summons Issued as to Elmer's Home Services, LLC. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
9 9 4 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 02/25 11:24 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. Signed by Judge Jason K. Pulliam. (mgr)
Related: [-]
8 8 5 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 6:02 AM
STANDING ORDER for procedure in cases before Judge Pulliam. All parties and counsel are directed to review Judge Pulliam's Standing Order containing rules of practice, particularly the requirement of conference before filing a Motion to Dismiss under Federal Rule 12(b)(6) and demonstration of complete diversity. Failure to follow these rules of practice could result in the Court striking the Motion to Dismiss on its own initiative without further notice. Signed by Judge Jason Pulliam. (r013)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/24 3:46 PM
Case assigned to Judge Jason K. Pulliam. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (vl)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Mon 02/24 3:47 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (vl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 notice Notice Fri 02/21 2:09 PM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Jose Membreno (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/21 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Curt Hesse on behalf of Eric N Lopez, Alberto Valle. Attorney Curt Hesse added to party Eric N Lopez(pty:pla), Attorney Curt Hesse added to party Alberto Valle(pty:pla) (Hesse, Curt)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 02/21 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Moore on behalf of Eric N Lopez, Alberto Valle (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice Fri 02/21 9:58 AM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Alberto Valle (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice Fri 02/21 9:57 AM
NOTICE Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff by Eric N Lopez (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/21 9:52 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Eric N Lopez, Alberto Valle. (Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/21 9:50 AM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19820093), filed by Alberto Valle, Eric N Lopez.(Moore, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet