Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Raag Singhal
Referred: Jared M Strauss
Case #: 1:25-cv-20810
Nature of Suit345 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:51 AM EDT
Defendant
Carnival Corporation
d/b/a Carnival Cruise Line, a foreign Profit Corporation 3655 N.W. 87TH AVE.
Miami, FL 33178
Represented By
Lauren Nicole Cabeza
Mase Mebane
contact info
William Robert Seitz
Mase Mebane & Briggs, P.A.
contact info
Thomas Dennis Alan Briggs
Mase Mebane Seitz
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Spalding
Represented By
Laurence Marc Krutchik
Law Office Of Laurence M. Krutchik, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Tue 04/29 11:01 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Michael Essington. Mediation Hearing set for 7/24/2025 02:00 PM via video conference. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 4/28/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
20 20 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Thu 04/24 3:09 PM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Michael Essington as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for July 24, 2024 @ 2:00 p.m..(Cabeza, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Monday, April 07, 2025
19 19 respm Reply in Support of Motion Mon 04/07 4:56 PM
Plaintiff's REPLY in Support of Motion re13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike10 Answer to Complaint Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses . filed by Sharon Spalding.(Krutchik, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Emai exchange between counsel
Monday, March 31, 2025
18 18 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/31 5:09 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike10 Answer to Complaint Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses filed by Carnival Corporation. Replies due by 4/7/2025. (Cabeza, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
17 17 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 03/27 12:29 PM
DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss on 3/27/2025. See attached document for full details. (emd)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/27 12:19 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 5/18/2026 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 5/13/2026 02:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 5/9/2025., Discovery due by 1/28/2026., Expert Discovery due by 1/28/2026., Joinder of Parties due by 5/9/2025., In Limine Motions due by 3/18/2026., Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2026., Motions due by 2/11/2026., Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/1/2026.), (Mediation Deadline 2/4/2026.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
15 15 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 03/25 10:53 AM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Carnival Corporation(Cabeza, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Thursday, March 20, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 03/20 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Dennis Alan Briggs on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Thomas Dennis Alan Briggs added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Briggs, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
13 13 motion Strike Mon 03/17 11:45 AM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike10 Answer to Complaint Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by Sharon Spalding. Responses due by 3/31/2025. (Krutchik, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
12 12 4 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Wed 03/12 2:18 PM
Order Requiring Scheduling Report Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/12/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
11 11 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/11 3:38 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carnival Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Carnival Corporation d/b/a Carnival Cruise Line for Carnival Corporation (Cabeza, Lauren)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/11 3:23 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. (Seitz, William)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/11 3:09 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Nicole Cabeza on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Lauren Nicole Cabeza added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Cabeza, Lauren)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 03/11 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Robert Seitz on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney William Robert Seitz added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Seitz, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 02/25 8:22 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sharon Spalding. Carnival Corporation served on 2/24/2025, response/answer due 3/17/2025. (Krutchik, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/24 4:43 PM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sharon Spalding (Krutchik, Laurence)
Related: [-]
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 02/24 9:41 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS. Within SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/24/2025. (kcs)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other Mon 02/24 9:39 AM
NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Motions for Extension of Time Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC , 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Labeling Exhibits on CM/ECF Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Court's CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket Entry A party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley ) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Notices of Settlement Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings. Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/24/2025. (kcs)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 02/21 1:23 PM
Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 02/21 1:20 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 25 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/21 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18224373, filed by Sharon Spalding.(Krutchik, Laurence)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)