Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-11014

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Laurel M Isicoff
Case #: 1:25-ap-01044
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Continental Stock Transfer & Trust Company
Represented By
Continental Stock Transfer & Trust Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert A Angueira
1450 Brickell Avenue Suite 1900
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Paul Steven Singerman, Esq
contact info
Erin M Hoskins
contact info
Samuel J Capuano
Berger Singerman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
10 10 order Appear pro hac vice Order Mon 05/12 9:36 AM
Order Granting Motion for Sam Della Fera, Jr. to Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] # 9
Friday, May 09, 2025
9 9 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/09 3:02 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Sam Della Fera, Jr. [Fee Paid $250] Filed by Defendant Continental Stock Transfer & Trust Company (Calderin, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 05/09 3:04 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 25-01044 LMI] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 250.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46029592. Fee amount 250.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/24 9:06 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Robert A Angueira Related [+]. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing Amended/Renoticed/Continued
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 court Notice of Hearing [Amd/Rntc/Cntd] (AP) Wed 04/23 11:15 PM
Re- Notice of Scheduling Conference for 06/04/2025 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Sanabria, Noemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Filing Thu 04/17 5:45 PM
Notice of Filing Trustee's Motion to Approve: (1) Settlement and Release Agreement With Continental Stock Transfer & Trust Company, and (2) Payment of Contingency Fee , Filed by Plaintiff Robert A Angueira. (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/21 3:14 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 05/07/2025 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert A Angueira
4 4 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Fri 02/21 3:01 PM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Continental Stock Transfer & Trust Company Answer Due 3/24/2025 (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Thu 02/20 5:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Erin M Hoskins Filed by Plaintiff Robert A Angueira. (Hoskins, Erin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Thu 02/20 5:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Samuel J Capuano Filed by Plaintiff Robert A Angueira. (Capuano, Samuel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/20 3:53 PM
Adversary case 25-01044 Complaint by Robert A Angueira against Continental Stock Transfer & Trust Company. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Singerman, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Prospectus
Att: 2 Exhibit B - First Amendment to the Amended and Restated Certificate of Incorporation
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Investment Management Trust Agreement
Att: 4 Exhibit D - August 8, 2022, demand letter from Effectus
Att: 5 Exhibit E (Composite Exhibit) - First Berkowitz Demands
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Debtor's Form 8-K dated October 14, 2022
Att: 7 Exhibit G - October 20, 2022, correspondence between Continental, Mark Absher, and Scott Absher
Att: 8 Exhibit H - November 2, 2022, Board Resolution
Att: 9 Exhibit I - November 4, 2022, correspondence between Continental and Mark Absher
Att: 10 Exhibit J - November 11, 2022, authorization letter from Scott Absher to Continental
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Certificate of Dissolution
Att: 12 Exhibit L - Trust Summary Report
Att: 13 Exhibit M - November 24, 2022, email from Francis Wolf to Scott Absher and Mark Absher
Att: 14 Exhibit N - Continental Invoice No. 68529 dated November 30, 2022
Att: 15 Exhibit O - Transaction Information document
Att: 16 Exhibit P - Excerpt from the transcript of the deposition of Francis Wolf
Att: 17 Exhibit Q - Declaration of Francis Wolf dated February 26, 2024