California Central District Court
Judge:Mark C Scarsi
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:25-cv-01493
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Terminated:May 02, 2025
Case in other court:Los Angeles Superior Court, 24NWCV04943
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 2:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Starbucks Corporation
Represented By
Jonathan P Slowik
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Jennifer Joy McDermott
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Gregory W. Knopp
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Crystal Adams-King
Represented By
Jacob N Whitehead
W Employment Law, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
25 25 order Remand Case to State Court Mon 05/05 2:48 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: MOTION TO REMAND (ECF No. 13) AND STIPULATION TO STAY PENDING ARBITRATION (ECF No. 24) (JS-6) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi Denying13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court: The motion to remand is denied. Satisfied in its jurisdiction, the Court grants the stipulation for an order staying the action pending arbitration of Plaintiff's claims against Defendant. The Court orders the parties to submit Plaintiff's claims to arbitration within 30 days pursuant to the terms of the parties' arbitration agreement and the Federal Arbitration Act. The parties shall file a joint status report within 120 days, and a further report every 120 days thereafter. Each report must state on the cover page the date the next report is due. Additionally, the parties must notify the Court within seven days of the conclusion of arbitration proceedings. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
24 24 30+ pgs stip Order Thu 05/01 1:25 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Order To Stay Case re Binding Arbitration filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
23 23 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Mon 04/21 3:36 PM
MINUTES of Scheduling Conference held before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The Court confers with counsel regarding the status of the case and a possible arbitration clause. The parties are advised that the Court intends to deny the pending Motion to Remand and defers setting any pretrial and trial dates at this time. The parties are ordered to submit within 14 days either a stipulation to stay this action pending arbitration or a motion to compel arbitration. IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney for Plaintiff(s): Jacob N. Whitehead. Attorney for Defendant(s): Gregory W. Knopp. Courtroom Deputy: Stephen Montes Kerr. Time in Court: 5 mins. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (smo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
22 22 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 04/16 4:11 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION (ECF No.13 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse (ECF No.13 ) and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion(s), noticed for hearing on April 28, 2025, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
21 21 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 04/14 2:09 PM
REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Crystal Adams-King. (Whitehead, Jacob)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/14 1:46 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse13 Reply to Opposition filed by Plaintiff Crystal Adams-King. (Whitehead, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Fri 04/04 1:41 PM
OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse13 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jennifer J. McDermott,
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
18 18 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 04/02 6:07 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-4 days, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation..(Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
17 17 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Wed 04/02 4:25 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Miscellaneous Document15 (Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates) by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. The document is stricken. (smo)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 04/02 3:58 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Miscellaneous Document15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Filing was the schedule of PT and Trial dates which should have been submitted as a Separate Attachment to the Joint Rule 26(f) report docket no 15 In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
15 15 misc Miscellaneous Document Tue 04/01 7:33 PM
Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation re: Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan14 (Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Tue 04/01 7:26 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-4 days, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.. (Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
13 13 motion Remand Case to State Court Fri 03/21 7:15 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse filed by Plaintiff's Attorney Crystal Adams-King. Motion set for hearing on 4/28/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Whitehead, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration Of Jacob N. Whitehead In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion To Remand To State Court,
Att: 2 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion To Remand To State Court
Friday, February 28, 2025
12 12 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 02/28 11:48 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. Scheduling Conference set for 4/21/2025 at 10:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Fri 02/28 11:45 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
10 10 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 02/26 5:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form6 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form8 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form7 and Initial Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi served on February 26, 2025. (Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 02/26 4:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, of Notice to Adverse Party and to the Superior Court of Removal of Action to the United States District Court served on February 26, 2025. (Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 02/24 11:04 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 02/24 11:03 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 02/24 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/21 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, (Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration Fri 02/21 12:02 PM
DECLARATION of Havonnah Johnson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Declaration Fri 02/21 12:00 PM
DECLARATION of Jonathan Slowik re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/21 11:55 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/21 11:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24NWCV04943 Receipt No: ACACDC-39150694 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attorney Gregory W. Knopp added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Knopp, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 02/24 11:10 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-50, inclusive, Starbucks Corporation. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Crystal Adams-King. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/19/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A TO DECLARATION OF JONATHAN SLOWIK) (ghap)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 02/24 11:13 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Crystal Adams-King, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 1/24/2025, answer due 2/14/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Maddie Bright on behalf of CSC- Lawyers Incorporating Service-Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 1/24/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT D TO DECLARATION OF JONATHAN SLOWIK) (ghap)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 02/24 11:15 AM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. ( SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT E TO DECLARATION OF JONATHAN SLOWIK)(ghap)
Related: [-]