Member Case
Lead case is: 5:25-bk-50053

Missouri Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Cynthia A Norton
Case #: 5:25-bk-50060
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Colonial Gardens LLC
5840 NW Prairie View
Kansas City, MO 64151
Represented By
Larry E. Parres
Lewis Rice LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee Office
400 E. 9th Street Room 3440
Kansas City, MO 64106
Represented By
Jill Parsons
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, April 21, 2025
25 25 other Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 7:11 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-50060 for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of cash receipts and disbursements
Att: 2 Balance sheet
Att: 3 Profit and loss
Att: 4 Accounts receivable
Att: 5 Postpetition liabilities
Att: 6 schedule of payments to insiders
Att: 7 Bank reconciliations and bank statements
24 24 other Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Mon 04/21 4:20 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for Case Number 25-50060 for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of cash receipts and disbursements
Att: 2 Balance sheet
Att: 3 Profit and Loss
Att: 4 Accounts receivable
Att: 5 Postpetition liabilities
Att: 6 schedule of payments to insiders
Att: 7 Bank reconciliations
Att: 8 Bank statement
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
23 23 other Summary of Assets and Liabilities Wed 04/16 9:23 AM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Colonial Gardens, LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
22 22 other Verification by Debtor Mon 04/14 4:53 PM
Verification by Debtor to Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G, H and Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Colonial Gardens LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
21 21 other Rule 2015-2 A and B Thu 04/10 3:06 PM
Rule 2015-2 A and B Disclosures and Statement of Operations filed by Colonial Gardens LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
20 20 court Clerks Note - public (m) Tue 04/08 4:16 PM
Clerk's Notice - The Schedules and/or Statements filed do not satisfy the Order to Show Cause for Deficient Documents , therefore, the deadline of 4/6/2025 has not been terminated. The following documents are still missing and must be filed immediately or this case may be dismissed for failure to comply: Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information, Verification of Schedules (including a wet signature or appropriate e-signature software), and Local Rule 2015A and B Statements . (Donovan, Sydney)
Related: [-]
19 19 other Entry of Appearance Tue 04/08 3:43 PM
Entry of Appearance of Zachary R.G Fairlie on behalf of Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of DCA Outdoor, Inc., et al. (Fairlie, Zachary (aty))
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
18 18 other Schedules OR Amended Schedules/Statements Mon 04/07 7:45 PM
Schedule A/B, Schedule D, Schedule E/F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Statement of Financial Affairs, for Non-Individual Colonial Gardens, LLC . (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule B-11
Att: 2 Schedule 28
Att: 3 Schedule 47.1
Att: 4 Schedule 71
Att: 5 Schedule G-2.1
Att: 6 SOFA Schedule 3.1
17 17 other Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Mon 04/07 7:40 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 16, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/16 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/16/2025. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15
Friday, March 14, 2025
15 15 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Fri 03/14 2:10 PM
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Scheduled. Meeting to be held on 4/14/2025 at 09:00 AM at BY PHONE w/ UST 1-877-931-2506 Code: 3232936. (Donovan, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
14 14 court Clerks Note - public (m) Thu 03/06 3:07 PM
Clerk's Notice - An Order has been entered in this case in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of: Anna Evergreen, LLC (2226); Brehob Nurseries, LLC (3791); Colonial Farms, LLC (3736); Colonial Gardens Developments, LLC (2413); Colonial Gardens, LLC (9612); DCA Land Holding Company, LLC (4280); DCA Land Illinois, LLC (1397); DCA Land Indiana, LLC (4848); DCA Land Kansas, LLC (8049); DCA Land Kentucky, LLC (4280); DCA Land Missouri, LLC (6728); DCA Land Oregon, LLC (6830); KAT Nurseries, LLC (4682); PlantRight Supply, LLC (3464); Schwope Brothers Tree Farm, LLC (6725); Schwope Brothers West Coast, LLC (2354); Utopian Plants Indiana, LLC (8385); Utopian Transport, LLC (3456); Utopian Trees, Inc. (3868). The docket in the chapter 11 case of DCA Outdoor, Inc., Case No. 25-50053 11, should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (Donovan, Sydney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
13 13 other Amended Petition Tue 03/04 3:27 PM
Amended Petition to show modifications to statistical and administrative information, filed by Colonial Gardens LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
12 12 order OSC Deficiencies (CH 11 Business, Non Individual) Mon 02/24 10:31 AM
Order to Debtor(s) to Show Cause The Debtor(s) is to Show Cause why the order for relief should not be set aside, these bankruptcy proceedings dismissed and, if applicable, the discharge be denied or revoked for failure to provide Summary of Your Assets and Liabilities, Schedules A/B, D, E/F, G, H, Statement of Financial Affairs, Local Rule 2015-2A and B Statements . This order will be deemed vacated upon timely compliance with its provisions. It is so ORDERED by /s/ Cynthia A. Norton. Incomplete Filings due by 3/10/2025. The Court will serve this Order on parties not receiving electronic notice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Cervantes, Esperanza)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
11 11 order Ch 11 Preliminary Matters Fri 02/21 4:57 PM
Order on Preliminary Matters Signed on 2/21/2025. (Harden, Debra)Modified on 2/21/2025 (Harden, Debra)
Related: [-]
10 10 other Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Fri 02/21 2:49 PM
Debtor(s) Declaration Re: Electronic Filing filed by Colonial Gardens LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
9 9 other Verification by Debtor Fri 02/21 2:33 PM
Verification by Debtor to Creditor Matrix filed by Colonial Gardens LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Creditor Matrix
8 8 2 pgs other 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 02/21 2:32 PM
Non-Individual Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Case: List of creditors who have the 20 largest unsecured claims against you and are not insiders filed by Colonial Gardens LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
7 7 other Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Fri 02/21 2:31 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor filed by Colonial Gardens LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
6 6 other Equity Security Holders Fri 02/21 2:31 PM
Equity Security Holders filed by Colonial Gardens LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
5 5 advother Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 02/21 2:30 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed by Colonial Gardens LLC (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
4 4 other Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Fri 02/21 2:29 PM
Declaration under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Parres, Larry (aty))
Related: [-]
3 3 other Entry of Appearance - text only Fri 02/21 2:27 PM
Entry of Appearance by Jill Parsons on behalf of The Office Of The United States Trustee (Parsons, Jill (aty))
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Receipt Fri 02/21 2:25 PM
Receipt for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)( [LINK 25-50060 11] ) [other,volp11] (1738.00), with receipt number A18839081, in the amount of 1738.00 dollars . Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 4 pgs other Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 02/21 2:24 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. (Filing fee to be paid in the amount of $1738 today.) Chapter 11 Plan due by 06/23/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 06/23/2025. (Parres, Larry)
Related: [-]