Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:25-cv-80252
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Maria Borell
Defendant
Jane Does 1-10
Plaintiff
William R. Johnson
Represented By
Darren Joel Spielman
The Concept Law Group, P.A.
contact info
Alexander Daniel Brown
The Concept Law Group, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
27 27 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 05/08 4:22 PM
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, CALENDAR CALL, PRETRIAL DEADLINES, ANDTRIAL DATE, AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MEDIATION: (Fact Discovery due by 12/8/2025, Expert Discovery due by 12/8/2025, Dispositive Motions due by 1/6/2026, Jury Trial set for 4/6/2026 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, Calendar Call set for 4/1/2026 10:30 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg, Status Conference set for 2/18/2026 10:00 AM before Judge Robin L. Rosenberg.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 2/6/2026.) Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 5/8/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
26 26 3 pgs misc Status Report Thu 05/01 3:11 PM
STATUS REPORT by William R. Johnson (Spielman, Darren)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
25 25 13 pgs misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 04/25 1:59 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by William R. Johnson(Spielman, Darren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 17, 2025
24 24 order Order on Motion to Quash Order on Motion for Protective/Confidentiality Order Order on Motion to Vacate Thu 04/17 2:08 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying in part13 Defendant's Expedited Motion to Quash Subpoenas/Motion for a Protective Order/Motion to Vacate the Court's prior order permitting discovery to identify and serve Defendants. The subpoenas are quashed to the extent they seek information regarding Defendant Borell's address and/or location. However, the stay on the subpoenas is lifted as to the John Doe Defendants. Plaintiff must immediately provide to defense counsel copies of the subpoenas already served. Any documents Plaintiff receives in response to the subpoenas must be provided (attorneys-eyes-only) to defense counsel. Defense counsel shall have five days to object to any addresses revealed in the documents that are associated with Defendant Borell. If, after conferring, counsel cannot resolve any disputes arising from the subpoenaed documents, they shall email chambers to request a hearing, in accordance with the Court's Standing Discovery Order (DE 5). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/17/2025. (hk02)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion to Seal Thu 04/17 1:46 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot21 Defendant's Motion to File Under Seal her NYS Temporary Order of Protection. The Court recognized the existence of the order for purposes of the discovery hearing and adjudicating Defendant's motion to quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/17/2025. (hk02)
Related: [-]
22 22 minutes Discovery Hearing Thu 04/17 1:40 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart: Zoom Telephone Discovery Hearing on Defendant's expedited motion to quash subpoenas (DE 13) held on 4/17/2025. Total time in court: 40 minutes. (hk02)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
21 21 motion Motion to Seal (Public) Tue 04/15 5:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Seal Temporary Order of Protection entered for benefit of Maria Borell per Local Rule 5.4 by Maria Borell. (Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A - Affirmation of Maria Borell in New York defamation case,
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit B - Transcript of 12/15/23 Family Court Hearing attached as Exhibit 1 to Affirmation of Maria Borell in New York defamation case
20 20 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 04/15 3:18 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Richard Jay Burton re19 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Richard Jay Burton has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in any pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions.[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information] (pt)
Related: [-]
19 19 3 pgs notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Tue 04/15 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; by Richard Jay Burton (Burton, Richard)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 04/15 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Jay Burton on behalf of Maria Borell. Attorney Richard Jay Burton added to party Maria Borell(pty:dft). (Burton, Richard)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 04/15 10:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Maria Borell. Maria Borell waiver sent on 4/15/2025, response/answer due 6/16/2025. (Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Mon 04/14 5:46 PM
Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Maria Borell (Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion to Quash Order on Motion for Protective/Confidentiality Order Order on Motion to Vacate Mon 04/14 5:07 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot12 Defendant's Motion to Quash/for a Protective Order in light of the filing of Defendant's Amended Motion seeking the same relief (DE 13). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/14/2025. (hk02)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion to Quash Order on Motion for Protective/Confidentiality Order Order on Motion to Vacate Mon 04/14 5:04 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER taking under advisement13 Defendant's Expedited Motion to Quash Subpoenas/for a Protective Order and setting a Telephone Discovery Hearing for 4/17/2025 at 1:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Counsel shall appear telephonically using the following conference call instructions: Dial: 833-435-1820 (or 833-568-8864); Enter Meeting ID: 160 225 1740# and Passcode: 576690#. The subpoenas issued by Plaintiff's counsel are hereby STAYED pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's motion. Plaintiff's counsel shall advise the subpoenaed entities of this Order directing them to cease production of any responsive documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/14/2025. (hk02)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Quash Protective/Confidentiality Order Vacate Mon 04/14 1:14 PM
Amended MOTION to Quash , MOTION for Protective Order FOR RELIEF FROM MARCH 7, 2025 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE EXPEDITED DISCOVERY , MOTION to Vacate7 Order,, Terminate Motions, (EXPEDITED) ( Responses due by 4/28/2025.) by Maria Borell.(Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Maria Borell,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Appeal packet including Final Order and Certain Other Materials from New York Defamation Lawsuit
12 12 motion Quash Protective/Confidentiality Order Vacate Mon 04/14 12:49 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Quash , MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Vacate7 Order,, Terminate Motions, ( Responses due by 4/28/2025.) by Maria Borell.(Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 04/11 11:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc A Burton on behalf of Maria Borell. Attorney Marc A Burton added to party Maria Borell(pty:dft). (Burton, Marc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 misc Status Report Tue 04/01 3:40 PM
STATUS REPORT ON PROGRESS OF SERVICE by William R. Johnson (Spielman, Darren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 03/18 1:27 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address information as submitted through attorneys PACER account for attorney Darren Joel Spielman (pt)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Tue 03/18 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; Change of Email; Change of Law Firm Name; by Darren Joel Spielman (Spielman, Darren)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 03/07 11:56 AM
ORDER Granting 3 EX PARTE MOTION Leave to take expedited discovery filed by William R. Johnson. Plaintiff's Motion is hereby GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/7/2025. See attached document for full details. (scn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 misc Status Report Mon 03/03 3:40 PM
STATUS REPORT ON PROGRESS OF SERVICE by William R. Johnson (Spielman, Darren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 02/26 12:36 PM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 2/26/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
4 4 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Order of Requirements Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Tue 02/25 3:56 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS ON SERVICE, DEFAULTS, AND JOINT SCHEDULING REPORTS. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart for appropriate disposition of all pro hac vice motions, motions to substitute counsel, and pretrial motions related to discovery. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 02/24 8:28 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cwc)
Related: [-]
1 1 27 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/21 5:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18226142, filed by William R. Johnson.(Spielman, Darren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet