Kentucky Eastern District Court
Judge:Danny C Reeves
Referred: Candace J Smith
Case #: 2:25-cv-00026
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Case in other court:Boone Circuit Court, 24-CI-02092
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:07 AM EDT
Defendant
Bashir Hassan
Represented By
Lauren Lea Crosby Thompson
Kopka Pinkus Dolin, Pc - Lexington
contact info
Seth E. Fawns
Kopka Pinkus Dolin, Pc - Lexington
contact info
Defendant
YOPO Expedite, Inc
Represented By
Lauren Lea Crosby Thompson
Kopka Pinkus Dolin, Pc - Lexington
contact info
Seth E. Fawns
Kopka Pinkus Dolin, Pc - Lexington
contact info
Plaintiff
McKenson Lorfils
Represented By
Adrian M. Mendiondo
Morgan & Morgan, P.A. - Lex
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
11 11 misc Status Report Fri 05/02 7:31 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT May 2025 by McKenson Lorfils. (Mendiondo, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 misc Status Report Mon 04/07 7:37 AM
JOINT STATUS REPORT April 2025 by McKenson Lorfils. (Mendiondo, Adrian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
9 9 respoth Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bashir Hassan, YOPO Expedite, Inc. (Fawns, Seth)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Scheduling Order Deadline Fri 03/28 9:06 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) Parties to exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures w/in 14 days. 2) Expert witness list: Plaintiff: September 30, 2025; Defendant: November 11, 2025. If the evidence is intended solely to contradict or rebut evidence on the same subject matter identified by another party under Rule 26(a)(2)(B), the party shall disclose such experts and written reports within 30 days. 3) Supplementation due w/in 30 days of the discovery of new information, but NLT 30 prior to close of discovery. 4) Discovery due NLT December 31, 2025. 5) All discovery disputes are referred to the Magistrate Judge. 6) All motions for extensions of time are referred to the undersigned. 7) Extensions require approval of the Court. 8) Motions to amend pleadings/join additional parties due NLT June 30, 2025. 9) Dispositive motions/Daubert motions due NLT January 31, 2026. 10) PT filings due by April 21, 2026. 11) NLT April 28, 2026, counsel directed to pre-mark all exhibits. 12) Agreed Proposed Jury Instructions due by May 5, 2026. 13) Objections to use of deposition or admissibility of exhibits shall be filed NLT May 12, 2026. 14) PT filings shall be submitted to the undersigned via email. 15) NLT May 12, 2026, parties shall submit each exhibit to chambers. 16) JURY TRIAL set for 5/26/2026 at 09:00 AM in COVINGTON. Counsel to be present at 8:30 AM. Estimated length of trial is 3 days. 17) Parties may request a pretrial conference. 18) Parties directed to file joint status report the first Monday of each month. 19) Parties directed to use a private mediator in the event they seek to mediate their dispute. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/28/2025. (WHP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
6 6 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 03/27 12:01 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Thompson, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order For Meeting and Report Fri 03/07 10:39 AM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. Within thirty (30) days, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed discovery plan. 2. At the time of the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3. Within fourteen (14) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan (see a-i of order). Signed by District Judge Danny C Reeves on 03/07/2025.(SLG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 MJ Consent Form
Friday, February 21, 2025
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 02/21 5:08 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed in State Court Record by Bashir Hassan, YOPO Expedite, Inc. (WHP)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Fri 02/21 5:03 PM
FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by YOPO Expedite, Inc. (WHP)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Fri 02/21 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boone Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-02092. ( Filing fee $405; receipt number AKYEDC-6037951), filed by YOPO Expedite, Inc, Bashir Hassan.(WHP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Notice of Consent of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit - Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit - Summons Yopo,
Att: 6 Exhibit - Summons Hassan,
Att: 7 Exhibit - Interrogatories to YOPO,
Att: 8 Exhibit - Interrogatories to Bashir Hassan,
Att: 9 Exhibit - Courtesy Transaction Report,
Att: 10 Exhibit - Receipt,
Att: 11 Exhibit - Requests for Docs to Hassan,
Att: 12 Exhibit - Requests for Docs to YOPO,
Att: 13 Exhibit - Summons Hassan 2,
Att: 14 Exhibit - Return of Summons - Richardson Law Grp,
Att: 15 Exhibit - Return of Summons 2,
Att: 16 Exhibit - Answer of Bashir & YOPO
misc Conflict Check Fri 02/21 5:01 PM
Conflict Check run. (WHP)
Related: [-]
utility File Submitted Mon 02/24 9:17 AM
***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Danny C. Reeves for review:4 Answer to Complaint (WHP)
Related: [-]