Kansas District Court
Judge:John W Broomes
Referred: Angel D Mitchell
Case #: 6:25-cv-01033
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:52 AM CDT
Defendant
Steve O'Hara
Plaintiff
Blaylock Diesel Service, Inc.
Represented By
Todd A. Nelson
Gable Gotwals
contact info
Plaintiff
Switchblade Turbos, LLC
Represented By
Todd A. Nelson
Gable Gotwals
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/24 9:10 AM
ORDER granting12 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The motion is granted as unopposed. Defendant Steve O'Hara d/b/a TABS Technologies, LLC must answer or otherwise respond to the amended complaint by May 16, 2025 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/24/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/23 3:31 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Steve O'Hara Related [+] (Seibold, Christopher)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
Friday, April 11, 2025
11 11 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/11 9:23 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. The motion does not comply with the court's local rules because it does not state "whether there has been consultation with other parties and the views of other parties," nor was it filed "less than 3 days before the specified time." D. Kan. Rule 6.1(a). However, a party may obtain an order extending the time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 14 days without court approval. D. Kan. Rule 77.2(a)(2). Accordingly, defendant Steve O'Hara must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by April 25, 2025 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/11/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/10 4:06 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Steve O'Hara Related [+] (Seibold, Christopher)
Related: [-] ferred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell
9 9 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 04/10 3:58 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher J. Seibold on behalf of Steve O'Hara (Seibold, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
8 8 order Order Mon 03/10 3:15 PM
ORDER: The court ordered plaintiffs to show cause why the court should not recommend that the district judge dismiss this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction--namely, because plaintiffs did not adequately plead complete diversity of citizenship between the parties. (ECF 5.) Plaintiffs have now responded to the order to show cause and filed an amended complaint. (ECF 6, 7.) After reviewing the response and the amended complaint, the court is satisfied that plaintiffs have sufficiently alleged facts that the parties are completely diverse for subject matter jurisdiction purposes under 28 U.S.C. § 1332. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 3/10/2025. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(alh)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 1:54 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Blaylock Diesel Service, Inc., Switchblade Turbos, LLC.(Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
6 6 respm Reply/Objection to Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 03/10 1:53 PM
REPLY TO Response/Objection re5 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Blaylock Diesel Service, Inc., Switchblade Turbos, LLC, RESPONSE re5 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiffs Blaylock Diesel Service, Inc., Switchblade Turbos, LLC(Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
5 5 order Show Cause Mon 02/24 12:31 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/10/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 2/24/2025. (ca)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 02/21 3:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Blaylock Diesel Service, Inc., Switchblade Turbos, LLC. (Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Fri 02/21 2:56 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Blaylock Diesel Service, Inc., Switchblade Turbos, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 02/21 2:55 PM
ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Todd A. Nelson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint (attorney) Fri 02/21 2:54 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6590207.), filed by Blaylock Diesel Service, Inc., Switchblade Turbos, LLC.(Nelson, Todd)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 02/21 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at https://www.uscourts.gov/file/459/download (nac)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Fri 02/21 4:34 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steve O'Hara. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
Related: [-]