Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Case #: 4:25-cv-00169
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:08 AM CDT
Defendant
BKV Barnett, LLC
Represented By
Clark S Butler
Miller Knauff Law Firm
contact info
J J Knauff
Miller & Mccarthy PC
contact info
Defendant
BKV Corporation
Represented By
Clark S Butler
Miller Knauff Law Firm
contact info
J J Knauff
Miller & Mccarthy PC
contact info
Defendant
BKV Midstream, LLC
Represented By
Clark S Butler
Miller Knauff Law Firm
contact info
J J Knauff
Miller & Mccarthy PC
contact info
Defendant
BKV North Texas LLC
Represented By
Clark S Butler
Miller Knauff Law Firm
contact info
J J Knauff
Miller & Mccarthy PC
contact info
Defendant
BKV Operating, LLC
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
R H Wallace, Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Medina
Represented By
Carlos N. Monarrez
Valdez, Monarrez & San Miguel, PLLC
contact info
John M Cummings
Stephens, Anderson & Cummings LLP
contact info
Christopher M Ferraro
Christopher M Ferraro PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 04/22 3:35 PM
ORDER: Pending before the Court is Defendants' Unopposed Joint Motion to Substitute Counsel in the above-captioned case. ECF No.26 . Defendants' Motion is hereby GRANTED, and L. Scot Dailey is substituted as counsel for Defendants in place of J.J. Knauff and Clark S. Butler who are withdrawn as counsel in this matter. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/22/2025) (sre)
Related: [-]
27 27 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 04/22 12:04 PM
ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint,, filed by BKV Barnett, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC, BKV Operating, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Clark S Butler added to party BKV Operating, LLC(pty:dft) (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 04/22 10:15 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney L Scot Dailey,L Scot Dailey,L Scot Dailey for BKV Operating, LLC,L Scot Dailey,L Scot Dailey for BKV North Texas LLC,L Scot Dailey,L Scot Dailey for BKV Midstream, LLC,L Scot Dailey,L Scot Dailey for BKV Corporation,L Scot Dailey,L Scot Dailey for BKV Barnett, LLC. Motion filed by BKV Operating, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Barnett, LLC Attorney L Scot Dailey added to party BKV Barnett, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney L Scot Dailey added to party BKV Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney L Scot Dailey added to party BKV Midstream, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney L Scot Dailey added to party BKV North Texas LLC(pty:dft), Attorney L Scot Dailey added to party BKV Operating, LLC(pty:dft) (Dailey, L)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 04/02 4:10 PM
ORDER: Before the Court is the Defendants19 Motion to Dismiss. Having reviewed the Motion, docket entries, and applicable law, the Court finds that the Motion should be and is denied. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/2/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Issued Wed 04/02 3:50 PM
Summons Issued as to BKV Operating, LLC. (jnp)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Wed 04/02 2:52 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons in a Civil Case filed by Michael Medina. (Cummings, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
22 22 11 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 03/25 4:20 PM
PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against BKV Barnett, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC, BKV Operating, LLC filed by Michael Medina. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (wxc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
21 21 respm Appendix in Support Mon 03/24 3:47 PM
Appendix in Support filed by BKV Barnett, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC re19 MOTION to Dismiss (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]
20 20 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Mon 03/24 3:46 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by BKV Barnett, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC re19 MOTION to Dismiss (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 03/24 3:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss filed by BKV Barnett, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Mon 03/24 9:20 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting17 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/24/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
17 17 motion Leave to File Fri 03/21 2:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Michael Medina (Cummings, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
16 16 order Scheduling Order Order For ADR Tue 03/18 9:17 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning April 27, 2026. Counsel and the Parties must be ready for trial on two days' notice at any time during those four weeks. Joinder of Parties due by 5/17/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/29/2025. Discovery due by 11/28/2025. Motions due by 12/28/2025. Pretrial Order due by 4/2/2026. The court appoints Judge R H Wallace, Jr as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/18/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 03/18 9:19 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:16. Tue Mar 18 09:19:34 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
15 15 misc Status Report Mon 03/17 2:33 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by BKV Barnett, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC. (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
14 14 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 03/14 1:12 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Medina. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Cummings, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
misc Order Receipt Tue 03/11 2:11 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:13. Tue Mar 11 14:11:05 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
13 13 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/10 3:17 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher M. Ferraro. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/10/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/10 2:50 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christopher M. Ferraro (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15326721) filed by Michael Medina (Cummings, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 1 pgs order Order Unfiling Pleading Mon 03/10 2:17 PM
Order Unfiling10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christopher M. Ferraro (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15325892) filed by Michael Medina due to the following deficiency: An attorney seeking pro hac vice admission must apply for admission on an approved form and pay the applicable fee. See LR 83.9(b) or LCrR 57.9(b).Must file using the approved form found on the Northern District of Texas website. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/10/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/10 1:29 PM
***UNFILED PER ORDER11 *** Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing for Attorney Christopher M. Ferraro (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15325892) filed by Michael Medina (Cummings, John) Modified on 3/10/2025 (wxc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 10 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/10 1:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Michael Medina. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cummings, John)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 03/10 2:19 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:11. Mon Mar 10 14:19:54 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
8 8 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 02/25 11:53 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendants BKV Barnett, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC. (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 02/25 10:48 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendants BKV Barnett, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC. (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 02/25 10:39 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BKV Barnett, LLC, BKV Corporation, BKV Midstream, LLC, BKV North Texas LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
5 5 5 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Mon 02/24 10:36 AM
ORDER: As a result of the Scheduling Conference, counsel must prepare and submit a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order (Joint Report) by March 17, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/24/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Mon 02/24 10:33 AM
ORDER: The Court ORDERS that (1) by March 10, 2025, Plaintiff(s) file an amended complaint and (2) within 14 days after Plaintiff(s) file an amended complaint, but no later than March 24, 2025, Defendant(s) file an answer or other response to the amended complaint. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/24/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 02/24 8:21 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. Mon Feb 24 08:21:14 CST 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
3 3 qcref Pittman Mon 02/24 8:20 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (mmw)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Administrative Record Fri 02/21 4:53 PM
Administrative Record consisting of Appendix filed by Clark Butler. (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/21 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Clark Butler. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-15285879) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Butler, Clark)
Related: [-]