California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:25-cv-01516
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Terminated:Mar 24, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 2:32 AM PDT
Defendant
Abraham Striks Realty Company, L.P.
Defendant
Eastern Costume, Inc.
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Moises Villalobos
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 24, 2025
11 11 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 03/24 2:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 misc Declaration Mon 03/03 4:23 PM
DECLARATION of JASON YOON LEAD TRIAL COUNSEL filed by Plaintiff Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 02/25 11:10 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 02/24 11:42 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Abraham Striks Realty Company, L.P., Eastern Costume, Inc. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 02/24 11:31 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 02/24 11:30 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 02/24 11:30 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Fri 02/21 3:23 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/21 3:18 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/21 3:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Moises Villalobos. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/21 3:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39154152 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Moises Villalobos(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]