Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Brandy R Mcmillion
Referred: Patricia T Morris
Case #: 1:25-cv-10498
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Gratiot County Sheriff
Defendant
Joseph Vozar
Plaintiff
Lacie Braman
Represented By
Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr.
The Mastromarco Firm
contact info
Kevin J. Kelly
The Mastromarco Firm
contact info
Victor Joseph Mastromarco, III
The Mastromarco Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
14 14 order Scheduling Order Thu 05/08 11:18 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REQUIREMENTS AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact and Expert Discovery due by 12/16/2025 ; Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/16/2026 ; Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2026 at 02:30 PM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion in Courtroom 251 ; and Jury Trial set for 7/14/2026 at 08:30 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion in Courtroom 251. Signed by District Judge Brandy R. McMillion. Related [+] (LHos)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 05/08 11:10 AM
Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/8/2025. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (LHos)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Mon 04/28 3:24 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Ferrand, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
12 12 misc Attorney Appearance Thu 04/10 1:19 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gouri G. Sashital appearing on behalf of Joseph Vozar (Sashital, Gouri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
11 11 notice Appear* Tue 04/08 8:34 AM
ORDER TO ATTEND TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR SUBMISSION OF DISCOVERY PLAN: Scheduling Conference set for 5/8/2025 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Brandy R. McMillion . **Plan due 5/1/25. Please see order for call information. (LHos)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Gratiot County Sheriff. (Ferrand, Timothy)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance Mon 04/07 4:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Ferrand on behalf of Gratiot County Sheriff. (Ferrand, Timothy)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/07 10:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Joseph Vozar. (Fleury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 04/07 10:08 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Thomas L. Fleury appearing on behalf of Joseph Vozar (Fleury, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/28 12:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gratiot County Sheriff served on 3/3/2025, answer due 3/24/2025. (Kelly, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
5 5 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 03/21 3:27 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor Joseph Mastromarco, III appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Attorney Appearance Fri 03/21 3:21 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Victor J. Mastromarco, Jr appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mastromarco, Victor)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
3 3 service Summons Issued* Fri 02/21 1:22 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Joseph Vozar* (SSch)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 02/21 1:22 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Gratiot County Sheriff* (SSch)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 02/21 1:23 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
1 1 24 pgs COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-10126279 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Gratiot - County Where Action Arose: Gratiot - County of 1st Defendant: Gratiot. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Kelly, Kevin)
Related: [-]