Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Denise Page Hood
Referred: Kimberly G Altman
Case #: 2:25-cv-10499
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Clay Township Police Department
Defendant
James Pelletier
Plaintiff
Stephen P. Kelly
General Delivery U.S. Post Office
Port Huron, MI 48061


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/07 2:24 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stephen P. Kelly re4 Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (JPar)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/06 12:23 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Stephen P. Kelly re Text-Only Reassignment (JPar)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 order Directing Service by the US Marshal Fri 04/04 4:25 PM
ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Complete Service Documents and for Service of Process by the US Marshal. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 04/04 4:23 PM
ORDER Granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion - Free Fri 04/04 4:20 PM
ORDER Denying Motions to Direct Service of Process Under Rule 45 &6 . Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Fri 04/04 4:27 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re7 Order on Motion - Free,9 Directing Service by the US Marshal,8 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Stephen P. Kelly at General Delivery U.S. Post Office, Port Huron, MI 48061. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
order Text-Only Reassignment Tue 03/25 2:09 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Sean F. Cox to District Judge Denise Page Hood pursuant to Administrative Order 25-AO-005. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
6 6 motion Motion - Free Tue 03/18 10:18 AM
MOTION to direct service of process under a Rule (4) waiver by Stephen P. Kelly. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
5 5 motion Motion - Free Tue 03/11 1:52 PM
MOTION to direct service of process under a Rule (4) waiver by Stephen P. Kelly. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
4 4 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Mon 02/24 3:43 PM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (THum)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Fri 02/21 3:13 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Stephen P. Kelly. (JHea)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 02/21 3:12 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Stephen P. Kelly against Clay Township Police Department, James Pelletier (JHea)
Related: [-]