Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Robert J Colville
Case #: 2:25-cv-00226
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 05/13 5:07 PM
Judge Robert J. Colville presiding in case. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly referred. (sms)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 appeal Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court Tue 05/13 4:43 PM
APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by PATRICK MATTHEWS re4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (sms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
motion Consolidate Cases Tue 05/13 4:44 PM
w/8 MOTION to Consolidate with civil action no. 2:25-cv-247 by PATRICK MATTHEWS. (sms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
7 7 misc Authorization by Prisoner Wed 04/23 11:38 AM
Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by PATRICK MATTHEWS. (jkn)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 04/23 11:38 AM
COMPLAINT against MERCER COUNTY JAIL, filed by PATRICK MATTHEWS. (jkn)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Practice Order for Pro Se Civil Rights Cases Wed 04/23 11:03 AM
STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/23/2025. (mpg)
Related: [-]
4 4 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 04/23 10:43 AM
ORDER granting1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the complaint. Please read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 4/23/2025. (mpg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
3 3 misc Consent to Trial by Mag. Judge OR District Judge Option Fri 02/21 4:25 PM
CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by PATRICK MATTHEWS. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
2 2 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Fri 02/21 4:25 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by PATRICK MATTHEWS. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/21 4:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by PATRICK MATTHEWS. (jkn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion,
Att: 2 Prisoner Authorization Form,
Att: 3 Envelope