Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Christopher P Tuite
Case #: 8:25-cv-00433
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Terminated:Apr 16, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Wed 04/16 11:18 AM
ORDER granting Amore's 1 motion for the appointment of counsel. The Clerk is DIRECTED to STAY and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case until Judge Tuite appoints counsel. No later than 14 DAYS after the appointment of counsel, Amore must move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/16/2025. (JT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
5 5 6 pgs misc Status report Wed 02/26 4:17 PM
STATUS Report In Response to Court's4 Order by Shaun Klucznik. (Palmer, Bobby) Modified docket text on 2/27/2025 (JOS)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
7 7 18 pgs misc Supplement Wed 02/26 4:43 PM
SUPPLEMENT re3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Kristopher Amore. (GL)
Related: [-]
6 6 7 pgs misc Supplement Wed 02/26 4:41 PM
SUPPLEMENT re2 Complaint by Kristopher Amore. (GL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
4 4 1 pgs order Order Directing Compliance Fri 02/21 4:53 PM
ORDER directing Legal Counsel for Sheriff Al Nienhuis, to file a status report after directing jail officials to check on Amore's welfare. The Clerk is DIRECTED to IMMEDIATELY e-mail a copy of this Order and Amore's 2 [2-1] complaint and attachment to Ashley Miller (amiller@hernandosheriff.org). Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/21/2025. (JT)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 02/21 3:17 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Kristopher Amore.(GL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope
2 2 24 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/21 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kristopher Amore.(GL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope
Thursday, February 20, 2025
1 1 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 02/21 1:49 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kristopher Amore.(GL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mailing Envelope