Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 3:25-cv-00048
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:38 AM EDT
Defendant
Andrew Southern
Plaintiff
Progressive Mountain Insurance Company
Represented By
John Timothy Wooten
Gower Wooten Darneille, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/19 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company (Wooten, John)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Wed 03/19 3:13 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(i) (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 03/19 3:13 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
misc Clerk's Notation for LOA/CIP Fri 03/07 12:30 PM
Clerk's Notation re2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/21 3:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Corporate Parent Progressive Commercial Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (dmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/21 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14087989) filed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company.(dmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet