South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-00971
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Feb 20, 2025
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 06, 2025 6:26 AM EDT
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By
Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Adams And Reese (col)
contact info
Defendant
Flexshopper LLC
Defendant
Gravamen Asset Management Group LLC
Plaintiff
Robert Shields
Represented By
Dave Maxfield
Dave Maxfield, Attorney, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 04/14 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Robert Shields as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Only (Maxfield, Dave)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
10 10 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 03/18 4:20 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Gravamen Asset Management Group LLC per7 . (sshe, )
Related: [-]
9 9 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 03/18 4:16 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Flexshopper LLC only per8 . (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
8 8 misc Request for Entry of Default Mon 03/17 4:31 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to FlexShopper, LLC, Only byRobert Shields.(Maxfield, Dave)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Service, FlexShopper
7 7 motion Entry of Default Mon 03/17 3:49 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default as to Gravamen Asset Management Group, LLC, d/b/a Kessler & Williams by Robert Shields. Response to Motion due by 3/31/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Maxfield, Dave)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope Proof of Service & Tracking
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order Tue 03/11 11:55 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/11/2025. (ltap, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 02/27 3:51 PM
NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Only by Robert Shields (Maxfield, Dave)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
4 4 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Wed 02/26 4:36 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Shields.(Maxfield, Dave)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 02/21 12:52 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 02/21 12:51 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Charleston County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2025-CP 10-0263 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12278594), filed by Experian Information Solutions Inc, Flexshopper LLC, Gravamen Asset Management Group LLC.(sshe, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents Summons and Complaint