New York Western District Court
Case #: 1:25-mj-00027
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2025
Terminated:Jan 24, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Feb 23, 2025 2:15 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Maeve Eileen Huggins
United States Attorney'S Office - Buffalo
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hunter Burnette (1)
Terminated: 01/24/2025
Represented By
Fonda Dawn Kubiak
Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/23/2025 2:59 AM EST
Friday, January 24, 2025
Arrest (Rule 5) of Hunter Burnette (LMG)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Hunter Burnette held on 1/24/2025. Defendant requested assigned counsel and handed up a Financial Affidavit. Defendant sworn, questioned and found eligible. AFPD Fonda Kubiak assigned. Defendant and defense counsel acknowledged receipt of a copy of the Criminal Complaint and Arrest Warrant issued out of the Northern District of New York. Defendant waived a reading of the Criminal Complaint and entered a plea of not guilty to the charges set forth therein. Defendant waived Identity Hearing, Preliminary Hearing and Detention Hearing in this district and handed up a signed Waiver. Court reserved defendant's right to these hearings and any other rights he is entitled to when he appears in the Northern District of New York. Court remanded defendant to the custody of the U.S. Marshals Service for transport to the Northern District of New York. APPEARANCES: AUSA Maeve Huggins for the government; AFPD Fonda Kubiak with defendant; USPO Brian Mamizuka. (Court Reporter FTR Gold)(LMG)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Hunter Burnette (LMG)
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Hunter Burnette. (LMG)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER of Rule 5(c)(3) Hearing by Hunter Burnette (LMG)
Related: [-]
4 4 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Hunter Burnette. Defendant committed to District of Northern District of New York (Albany). Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 1/24/25.(LMG)
Related: [-]
5 5 Notice to Northern District of New York (Albany) of a Rule 5, Rule 32, or Rule 40 Appearance as to Hunter Burnette. Your case number is: 1:25-MJ-07 (DJS). Docket sheet and documents attached. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to caseadmins@nywd.uscourts.gov. If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov.) (LMG)
Related: [-]