Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Case #: 1:25-cv-00589
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 09, 2025 3:20 AM MDT
Defendant
Castle Rock Police Department
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Ciara Nicole Kimminau
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Tim Gorman
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Ciara Nicole Kimminau
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Town of Castle Rock
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Ciara Nicole Kimminau
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Defendant
Tim (I) Gorman
Represented By
Andrew David Ringel
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Ciara Nicole Kimminau
Hall & Evans LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Melissa Manzanares
Represented By
Christopher M.A. Lujan
Empower P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
19 19 order Scheduling Order Tue 05/13 2:20 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 05/13/2025. Discovery due by 2/27/2026. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2026. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2026 02:00 PM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. (spric)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Scheduling Conference Tue 05/13 2:13 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for the Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung held on 5/13/2025. FTR: C205. (spric)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
17 17 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Tue 05/06 3:20 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Melissa Manzanares. (Lujan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/28 5:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial by Town of Castle Rock, Castle Rock Police Department, Tim Gorman, Tim (I) Gorman.(Kimminau, Ciara)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 04/22 8:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court is the Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order (the "Motion"). ECF No.13 . For good cause shown, the Motion, ECF No.13 , is GRANTED. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/6/2025. Scheduling Conference reset for 5/13/2025 11:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/21/2025.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
14 14 order Memorandum Fri 04/18 2:22 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order filed by Melissa Manzanares. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/18/2025. Text Only Entry (pablc7, )
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/18 2:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Melissa Manzanares. (Lujan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 03/10 3:46 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ciara Nicole Kimminau on behalf of Town of Castle Rock, Castle Rock Police Department, Tim Gorman, Tim (I) GormanAttorney Ciara Nicole Kimminau added to party Town of Castle Rock(pty:dft), Attorney Ciara Nicole Kimminau added to party Castle Rock Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Ciara Nicole Kimminau added to party Tim Gorman(pty:dft), Attorney Ciara Nicole Kimminau added to party Tim (I) Gorman(pty:dft) (Kimminau, Ciara)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
11 11 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/07 12:03 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/07/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Letter Reassigning Case Fri 03/07 9:32 AM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. All parties do not consent. All future pleadings should be designated as 25-cv-589-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
9 9 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Thu 03/06 4:51 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Melissa Manzanares, Defendants Town of Castle Rock, Castle Rock Police Department, Tim Gorman, Tim (I) Gorman All parties do not consent.. (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
8 8 service Waiver of Return of Service - Executed - Complaint Thu 02/27 1:04 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melissa Manzanares. All Defendants. (Lujan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 02/26 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew David Ringel on behalf of Town of Castle Rock, Castle Rock Police Department, Tim Gorman, Tim (I) GormanAttorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Town of Castle Rock(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Castle Rock Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Tim Gorman(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew David Ringel added to party Tim (I) Gorman(pty:dft) (Ringel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 order Minute Order Tue 02/25 10:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Magistrate Consent Form due 4/22/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/22/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2025 10:45 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference . Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 2/25/2025. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
5 5 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 02/25 8:37 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs misc Memorandum Returning Case Tue 02/25 8:37 AM
MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung for all further proceedings. Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Mon 02/24 9:53 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons were issued. (echa, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Mon 02/24 9:50 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 23, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 02/23 2:44 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Castle Rock Police Department, Tim Gorman, Town of Castle Rock (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10170411)Attorney Christopher M.A. Lujan added to party Melissa Manzanares(pty:pla), filed by Melissa Manzanares.(Lujan, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet