New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Referred: Robert W Lehrburger
Case #: 1:25-cv-01526
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Capital One, N.A.
Represented By
Ahmed Hassan Khattab
Troutman Pepper Locke LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joseph W. Foley
70 Irving Place
New York, NY 10003


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
58 58 order Order Wed 05/21 10:01 AM
ORDER. Dkts. 16 and 17 are terminated as moot in light of subsequent proceedings. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger) (Text Only Order) (Rodriguez, Dillon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Tue 05/20 6:42 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 55 NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ar)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
57 57 misc Rule 56.1 Statement Tue 05/20 6:51 PM
PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS. Document filed by Joseph W. Foley. (jjc)
Related: [-]
56 56 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 05/20 6:44 PM
DECLARATION OF JOSEPH W. FOLEY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re:54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Joseph W. Foley. (ar)
Related: [-]
55 55 19 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 05/20 6:43 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment re:54 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Joseph W. Foley. (ar)
Related: [-]
54 54 motion Partial Summary Judgment Tue 05/20 3:32 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Joseph W. Foley. (ar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
53 53 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 05/15 4:50 PM
ORDER: As discussed at the conference held via Microsoft Teams on May 15, 2025: 1. Plaintiff may proceed with filing a summary judgment motion devoted to the following issue: Assuming that Plaintiff never signed a document agreeing to personal liability for the Capital One credit card accounts of his corporate entities (LLCs, or other form if applicable), can Plaintiff nevertheless be personally liable based on the terms of the Capital One Customer Agreements and customer kits appearing at Dkt. 51-1 through 51-4, whether alone or in combination with use of the credit card accounts by those corporate entities? 2. In conjunction with addressing the substantive summary judgment issue set forth above, the parties shall also address what jurisdiction's law - New York, Virginia, or other - governs determination of the issue. 3. Plaintiff shall file his opening brief by May 21, 2025. Defendant shall file its opposition by June 4, 2025. Plaintiff shall file his reply, if any, by June 6, 2025. 4. Plaintiff's letter motion at Dkt. 40 for preclusion and sanctions are denied without prejudice to renew. SO ORDERED. Copies transmitted this date to all parties. (Brief due by 5/21/2025., Reply to Response to Brief due by 6/6/2025., Responses to Brief due by 6/4/2025.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 5/15/2025) (mml)
Related: [-]
minutes Case Management Conference Thu 05/15 12:16 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger: Case Management Conference held on 5/15/2025 at 11:30 a.m. (rsh)
Related: [-]