South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph F Anderson, Jr
Case #: 0:25-cv-01049
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Darrell LeGrand
Plaintiff
TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas L Stephenson
Stephenson And Murphy
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
16 16 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Tue 04/22 6:09 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Darrell LeGrand.(Brown, Andrew)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Transfer Case Tue 04/22 6:05 AM
MOTION to Transfer Case (Venue) by Darrell LeGrand. Response to Motion due by 5/6/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Brown, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support
14 14 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 04/22 5:49 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Darrell LeGrand. Response to Motion due by 5/6/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Brown, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 TitleMax Notice of Appeal,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Index,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 1,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 2,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 3,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 4,
Att: 8 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 5,
Att: 9 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 6,
Att: 10 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 7,
Att: 11 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 8,
Att: 12 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 9,
Att: 13 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 10,
Att: 14 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 11,
Att: 15 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 12,
Att: 16 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 13,
Att: 17 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Awards Part 14,
Att: 18 Exhibit 3 JAMS Minimum Standards,
Att: 19 Exhibit 4 Tilray Brands v Dickson,
Att: 20 Exhibit 5 Declaration of Darrell LeGrand
Friday, April 18, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Fri 04/18 8:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc..(Stephenson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Proof of Service - Brown
Monday, April 07, 2025
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served Mon 04/07 12:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc.. Darrell LeGrand served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 03/13 11:51 AM
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Supplemental Order Regarding Service of Process Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 3/13/2025.(jpet, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/11 3:57 PM
MOTION Motion for Supplemental Order Regarding Service of Process by TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 3/25/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stephenson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/10 12:29 PM
ORDER granting 8 Motion for Order Regarding Service of Process. Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 3/10/2025.(jpet, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 03/07 3:02 PM
MOTION Renewed Motion for Order Regarding Service of Process by TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 3/21/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stephenson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Correspondence to Drew Brown 03.05.25
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/04 4:42 PM
ORDER denying 6 Motion Motion for Service of Process under FRCP 4(e) or in the Alternative by US Marshal Signed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 3/4/2025.(jpet, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 02/28 1:53 PM
MOTION Motion for Service of Process under FRCP 4(e) or in the Alternative by US Marshal by TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc.. Response to Motion due by 3/14/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Stephenson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/25 2:03 PM
Summons Issued as to Darrell LeGrand. (jpet, )
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
2 2 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 02/24 9:36 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc..(jpet, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award Mon 02/24 9:36 AM
PETITION TO VACATE ARBITRATION AWARD as to Darrell LeGrand ( Filing fee $ 405. Receipt number ASCDC-12282443.), filed by TitleMax of South Carolina, Inc..(jpet, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Interim Award,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Final Award,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Legrand v. TitleMax of South Carolina Interim Award,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - TitleMax of South Carolina v. Legrand Final Award,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Legrand, D. - Contract 10-28-14,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Legrand, D. - Contract 12/22/14,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Legrand, D. - Contract 11/02/15,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Legrand, D. - Contract 6/05/17,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Legrand, D. - Contract 8/20/18