Virginia Western District Court
Judge:Norman K Moon
Case #: 6:25-cv-00017
Nature of Suit448 Civil Rights - Education
Cause20:1681 - Title IX of the Education Amendment of 1972
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 7:02 PM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
22 22 34 pgs ANSWER to Complaint1 Complaint, by Dondi E. Costin, Jonathan Falwell, Steve Ferro, Steve Foster, Liberty University, Inc., Ashley Reich.(Tower, King)
Related: [-]
21 21 7 pgs Brief / Memorandum in Support re20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Jonathan Falwell. (Tower, King)
Related: [-]
20 20 3 pgs MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jonathan Falwell. (Tower, King)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steve Ferro (Tower, King)
Related: [-]
18 18 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Steve Foster (Tower, King)
Related: [-]
17 17 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ashley Reich (Tower, King)
Related: [-]
16 16 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dondi E. Costin (Tower, King)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jonathan Falwell (Tower, King)
Related: [-]
14 14 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty University, Inc. (Tower, King)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties.[LINK:Click here to access the Consent Form] (aab)
Related: [-]
12 12 Notice of Filing Requirement to Liberty University, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response.[LINK:Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form.] This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (aab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 NOTICE of Appearance by King Fitchett Tower on behalf of All Defendants (Tower, King)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
10 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Peter Brake. Steve Foster waiver sent on 2/27/2025, answer due 4/28/2025.(Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
9 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Peter Brake. Steve Ferro waiver sent on 2/27/2025, answer due 4/28/2025.(Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Peter Brake. Liberty University, Inc. waiver sent on 2/27/2025, answer due 4/28/2025.(Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
7 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Peter Brake. Jonathan Falwell waiver sent on 2/27/2025, answer due 4/28/2025.(Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Peter Brake. Dondi E. Costin waiver sent on 2/27/2025, answer due 4/28/2025.(Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Peter Brake. Ashley Reich waiver sent on 2/27/2025, answer due 4/28/2025.(Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for GABRIELLE M. VINCI to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4623603. by Peter Brake. (Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for ANDREW T. MILTENBERG to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4623602. by Peter Brake. (Farmer, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
2 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peter Brake (al)
Related: [-]
1 1 35 pgs COMPLAINT against Dondi E. Costin, Jonathan Falwell, Steve Ferro, Steve Foster, Liberty University, Inc., Ashley Reich (Filing & Administrative fee $405, receipt number AVAWDC-4616681), filed by Peter Brake. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(al)
Related: [-]