New Jersey District Court
Judge:Michael E Farbiarz
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:25-cv-01418
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:55 AM EDT
Defendant
NEW CIBO VITA LLC
Represented By
JESSICA K. FORMICHELLA
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
LIZA M. WALSH
Walsh Pizzi O'Reilly Falanga LLP
contact info
Notice Only
PHV IAN M. BETTS
Notice Only
PETER J. HALEY
Notice Only
PHV KELLY HOGAN
Notice Only
PHV MATTHEW IVERSON
Notice Only
GREGG F. LOCASCIO
Notice Only
ROBIN A. MCCUE
Plaintiff
PIM BRANDS, INC.
Represented By
DAVID R. KING
Herrick, Feinstein LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
33 33 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 05/12 2:59 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by NEW CIBO VITA LLC re24 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PIM BRANDS INC.'S COMPLAINT (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
32 32 17 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition of Motion Mon 05/05 5:01 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by PIM BRANDS, INC. re24 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PIM BRANDS INC.'S COMPLAINT (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, April 17, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 04/17 9:57 AM
Reset Deadlines as to24 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 5/19/2025 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
31 31 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Wed 04/16 4:39 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PIM BRANDS INC.'S COMPLAINT . (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Mon 04/14 11:18 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, PATRICK J. RODGERS, MORGAN E. SMITH, MAXIME I. JARQUIN, DANNY M. AWDEH and JONATHAN Z. KING, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 04/11 5:12 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Patrick J. Rodgers to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 04/11 5:11 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Morgan E. Smith to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
28 28 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 04/11 5:10 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Maxime I. Jarquin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 04/11 5:08 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Danny M. Awdeh to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Fri 04/11 5:07 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Z. King to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 04/11 10:40 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW CIBO VITA LLC. (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Dismiss Fri 04/11 10:40 AM
MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PIM BRANDS INC.'S COMPLAINT by NEW CIBO VITA LLC.(WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 04/11 1:30 PM
Set Deadlines as to24 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II OF PIM BRANDS INC.'S COMPLAINT . Motion set for 5/5/2025 before Judge Michael E. Farbiarz. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Fri 04/11 2:27 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee for JONATHAN Z. KING, ESQ., DANNY M. AWDEH, ESQ., PATRICK J. RODGERS, ESQ., MAXIME I. JARQUIN, ESQ., and MORGAN E. SMITH, ESQ.: $ 1,250, receipt number NEW51815 (jr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 04/09 3:19 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Robin A. McCue to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16161412.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 04/09 3:18 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Gregg F. LoCascio to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16161405.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 04/09 3:17 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Matthew Iverson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16161397.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 04/09 3:16 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kelly Hogan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16161391.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 04/09 3:15 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Peter J. Haley to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16161381.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Wed 04/09 3:13 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ian M. Betts to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-16161372.) (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 04/09 4:38 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, IAN M. BETTS, KELLY HOGAN, MATTHEW IVERSON, GREGG F. LOCASCIO, PETER J. HALEY and ROBIN A. MCCUE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 3 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 1:52 PM
ORDER granting Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to GREGG F. LOCASCIO, ESQ., ROBIN A. MCCUE, ESQ., and IAN M. BETTS, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/7/2025. (ld, )
Related: [-]
16 16 3 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 1:48 PM
ORDER granting Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JONATHAN Z. KING, ESQ., DANNY M. AWDEH, ESQ., PATRICK J. RODGERS, ESQ., MAXIME I. JARQUIN, ESQ., and MORGAN E. SMITH, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/7/2025. (ld, )
Related: [-]
15 15 3 pgs order Order Mon 04/07 1:44 PM
ORDER granting Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to PETER J. HALEY, ESQ., MATTHEW IVERSON, ESQ., and KELLY HOGAN, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/7/2025. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
14 14 misc Letter Thu 04/03 1:54 PM
Letter from David R. King to Judge Espinosa requesting attorney pro hac vice admissions on consent.(KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration David R. King in Support of Pro Hac Vice Attorneys,
Att: 2 Declaration Danny M. Awdeh,
Att: 3 Declaration Jonathan Z. King,
Att: 4 Declaration Maxime I. Jarquin,
Att: 5 Declaration Morgan E. Smith,
Att: 6 Declaration Patrick J. Rodgers,
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order on Consent
13 13 misc Letter Thu 04/03 9:32 AM
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Andre M. Espinosa, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent.(WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Gregg F. LoCascio,
Att: 2 Certification of Robin A. McCue,
Att: 3 Certification of Ian M. Betts,
Att: 4 Certification of Liza M. Walsh,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 misc Letter Thu 04/03 8:57 AM
Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Honorable Andre M. Espinosa, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent.(WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Peter J. Haley,
Att: 2 Certification of Matthew Iverson,
Att: 3 Certification of Kelly Hogan,
Att: 4 Certification of Liza M. Walsh,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 28, 2025
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 03/28 1:21 PM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by NEW CIBO VITA LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/11/2025. (ld)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
11 11 misc Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order Thu 03/27 9:33 AM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA K. FORMICHELLA on behalf of NEW CIBO VITA LLC (FORMICHELLA, JESSICA)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 9:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of NEW CIBO VITA LLC (WALSH, LIZA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/13 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PIM BRANDS, INC.. NEW CIBO VITA LLC served on 3/7/2025, answer due 3/28/2025. (MANCUSO, ELIZABETH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 02/25 10:36 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to NEW CIBO VITA LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pm, )
Related: [-]
6 6 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Tue 02/25 10:33 AM
AO120 Trademark Form filed. (pm, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initiating Documents
Monday, February 24, 2025
5 5 misc Statement Mon 02/24 12:39 PM
STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 10.1(a) by PIM BRANDS, INC.. (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certification Mon 02/24 12:30 PM
Certification of Non-Arbitrability Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 201.1 on behalf of PIM BRANDS, INC. Re1 Complaint. (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certification Mon 02/24 12:20 PM
Certification of David R. King, Rule 11.2 Disclosure on behalf of PIM BRANDS, INC. Re1 Complaint. (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 02/24 12:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PIM BRANDS, INC.. (KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
1 1 31 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 02/24 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT against NEW CIBO VITA LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-16039266) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PIM BRANDS, INC..(KING, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/24 2:25 PM
Case assigned to Judge Michael E. Farbiarz and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (tjg, )
Related: [-]