New Mexico District Court
Judge:Sarah M Davenport
Referred: Kevin R Sweazea
Case #: 1:25-cv-00190
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 4:46 AM MDT
Defendant
Liberty Energy Inc
Represented By
Ada B Priest
Priest & Miller, LLP
contact info
Mark Walsh Allen
Priest And Miller, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Mustafa Awad
Represented By
Patrick Dennis
Doyle Dennis LLP
contact info
Michael Patrick Doyle
Doyle Dennis Avery LLP
contact info
Dathan Weems
Dathan L Weems Attorney At Law
contact info

GPO Mar 03 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea re 1 Complaint filed by Mustafa Awad directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by March 14, 2025 to properly allege diversity of citizenship. (ldm)
GPO Mar 28 2025
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by April 21, 2025. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for April 29, 2025 at 09:30 AM. Counsel and any pro se party shall call Judge Sweazea's WebEx Teleconference line at (855) 244-8681 and enter Meeting Number 2300 989 9447# to be connected to the conference. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than April 18, 2025. (ldm)
GPO Apr 29 2025
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Fact Discovery due by October 24, 2025. Expert Discovery due by November 21, 2025. Motions due by December 22, 2025. Consult attached order for additional deadlines. (ldm)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Sarah M Davenport as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States District Judge Judith C. Herrera no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Judith C. Herrera as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (eh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
23 23 7 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Remote Settlement Conference set for September 23, 2025 at 09:00 AM via Zoom. Confidential position papers due September 12, 2025. The Court will send out invitations for the Zoom proceedings by email to all counsel of record and any pro se parties approximately one week before the settlement conference. Telephonic Status Conference to confirm the parties' readiness for the settlement conference set for August 6, 2025 at 09:00 AM. The parties are directed to call the Court's WebEx teleconference line at (855) 244-8681, and enter Meeting Number 2300 989 9447# to join the status conference proceedings. Consult attached order for additional details and deadlines. (ldm)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Fact Discovery due by October 24, 2025. Expert Discovery due by November 21, 2025. Motions due by December 22, 2025. Consult attached order for additional deadlines. (ldm)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea ADOPTING16 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROVISIONAL DISCOVERY PLAN, filed by Liberty Energy Inc. (ldm)
Related: [-]
20 20 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on April 29, 2025. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
19 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mustafa Awad for Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
18 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Liberty Energy Inc For Initial Disclosures (Allen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
16 16 Joint Status Report And Provisional Discovery Plan by Liberty Energy Inc (Allen, Mark)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT : Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(2), the parties are reminded that a magistrate judge was assigned as the trial judge in this matter under 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties are advised that the Clerk will reassign this matter to a district judge as the trial judge no later than 10 days from the entry of this notice unless consents from all parties have been filed. The parties are free to withhold consent. If you have already entered your consent, you need not resubmit. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
15 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Energy Inc (Allen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dathan Weems on behalf of Mustafa Awad (Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
13 13 3 pgs INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. Joint Status Report due by April 21, 2025. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for April 29, 2025 at 09:30 AM. Counsel and any pro se party shall call Judge Sweazea's WebEx Teleconference line at (855) 244-8681 and enter Meeting Number 2300 989 9447# to be connected to the conference. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than April 18, 2025. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
12 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Walsh Allen on behalf of Liberty Energy Inc (Allen, Mark)
Related: [-]
11 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Liberty Energy Inc (Allen, Mark)
Related: [-]
10 10 Liberty Energy Inc.'s ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Liberty Energy Inc.(Allen, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 NOTICE by Mustafa Awad Notice of Certificate of Good Standing for Michael Doyle (Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE by Mustafa Awad Notice of Certificate of Good Standing for Patrick Dennis (Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Mustafa Awad by Dathan Weems on behalf of: Patrick Dennis Doyle Dennis Avery LLP 3401 Allen Parkway Ste 100 Houston TX 77019 (713) 571-1146 Pdennis@doylelawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9828300 re: # 8 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Mustafa Awad (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
ASSOCIATION of Attorney Licensed Outside the District for Plaintiff Mustafa Awad by Dathan Weems on behalf of: Michael Patrick Doyle Doyle Dennis Avery LLP 3401 Allen Parkway Ste 100 Houston TX 77019 (713) 571-1146 Mdoyle@doylelawfirm.com (Association Dues - Online Payment) (Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
Association Dues Received: $ 100 receipt number ANMDC-9828322 re: # 9 Association of Attorney Licensed Outside the District, filed by Mustafa Awad (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
5 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Liberty Energy Inc., filed by Mustafa Awad.(Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Photo of Injury
Summons Issued on Amended Complaint as to Liberty Energy Inc. (eh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
4 4 5 pgs ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea re1 Complaint filed by Mustafa Awad directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint by March 14, 2025 to properly allege diversity of citizenship. (ldm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
Summons Reissued as to Liberty Energy Inc. (bc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
1 1 8 pgs COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Liberty Energy Inc ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Mustafa Awad - Awad.(Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Photo of Injury
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9797041 re1 Complaint filed by Mustafa Awad - Awad (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Weems, Dathan)
Related: [-]
United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea assigned. (jg)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to Liberty Energy Inc. (jg)
Related: [-]