Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-14202

Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Ashely M Chan
Case #: 2:25-ap-00120
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Thomas J. Curran
725 E. Township Line Road, Basement
Blue Bell, PA 19422
Plaintiff
Aerofund Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
JESSE M. HARRIS
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/30 10:12 AM
Amended Complaint / First Amended Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 523(a)(2)(A) and 11 U.S.C. Section 727(a)(4) by JESSE M. HARRIS on behalf of Aerofund Holdings, Inc. against Thomas J. Curran. Related [+]. (HARRIS, JESSE)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Motion Tue 04/22 11:43 AM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by Thomas J. Curran. (PERLICK, ZACHARY)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Friday, April 11, 2025
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/11 12:26 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by ZACHARY PERLICK on behalf of Thomas J. Curran Related [+]. (PERLICK, ZACHARY)
Related: [-] 7
Thursday, April 10, 2025
8 8 misc Proposed Order Thu 04/10 4:00 PM
Proposed Order Re: Filed by ZACHARY PERLICK on behalf of Thomas J. Curran Related [+]. (PERLICK, ZACHARY)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 04/10 3:55 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Thomas J. Curran Represented by ZACHARY PERLICK (Counsel). (PERLICK, ZACHARY)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Mon 03/17 10:36 AM
Certificate of Service of Complaint and Summons Filed by JESSE M. HARRIS on behalf of Aerofund Holdings, Inc. Related [+]. (HARRIS, JESSE)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Monday, March 10, 2025
5 5 court Summons Issued Mon 03/10 9:43 AM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) Thomas J. Curran Date Issued 3/10/2025, Answer Due 4/9/2025. (G., Jeanette)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 4 misc Praecipe to Re-Issue Fri 03/07 1:16 PM
Praecipe to Re-Issue Summons Filed by JESSE M. HARRIS on behalf of Aerofund Holdings, Inc.. (HARRIS, JESSE)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Fri 02/21 4:20 PM
1 Summons Issued to Plaintiff(s) to be served upon Defendant(s) Thomas J. Curran Date Issued 2/21/2025, Answer Due 3/24/2025. (B., Keith)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Document Fri 02/21 2:37 PM
Document in re: / Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1 Filed by JESSE M. HARRIS on behalf of AEROFUND HOLDINGS, INC.. (HARRIS, JESSE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/21 2:24 PM
Adversary case 25-00120 Complaint by AEROFUND HOLDINGS, INC. against Thomas J. Curran. Fee Amount $350 / Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 523(a)(2)(A) and 11 U.S.C. Section 727(a)(4) . (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (HARRIS, JESSE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit a
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C