Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:James R Knepp II
Case #: 3:25-cv-00366
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Terminated:Mar 11, 2025
Case in other court:Lucas County Court of Common Pleas, CI2025-00193
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Impact Employment Solutions
Represented By
Carrie L. Urrutia
Eastman & Smith - Toledo
contact info
Jade L. Robinson
Eastman & Smith - Toledo
contact info
Plaintiff
Kibwe Rayford, Jr.
1657 Botkins Drive
Toledo, OH 43605

GPO Mar 11 2025
in good faith. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/11/2025. Copy sent to Kibwe Rayford, Jr., Apt. A, 1657 Botkins Drive, Toledo, OH 43605 by regular U.S. Mail on 3/11/2025. (R,EM) Memorandum Opinion and Order: It is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED, Apple v. Glenn, 183 F.3d 477, 479 (6th Cir. 1999) and this case is closed; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 6 and [6-1] Motions be, and the same hereby are, DENIED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is enjoined from filing any new Motions or documents in this case; and the Court FURTHER CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
8 8 order Judgment Tue 03/11 1:09 PM
Judgment Entry: For the reasons stated in this Court's7 Memorandum Opinion and Order, this action is dismissed. Further, the Court CERTIFIES pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(a)(3) that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/11/2025. Copy sent to Kibwe Rayford, Jr., Apt. A, 1657 Botkins Drive, Toledo, OH 43605 by regular U.S. Mail on 3/11/2025. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
7 7 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Restricted Filer Memorandum Opinion and Order Tue 03/11 1:05 PM
Memorandum Opinion and Order: It is ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED, Apple v. Glenn, 183 F.3d 477, 479 (6th Cir. 1999) and this case is closed; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's6 and [6-1] Motions be, and the same hereby are, DENIED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is enjoined from filing any new Motions or documents in this case; and the Court FURTHER CERTIFIES, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an appeal from this decision could not be taken in good faith. Judge James R. Knepp II on 3/11/2025. Copy sent to Kibwe Rayford, Jr., Apt. A, 1657 Botkins Drive, Toledo, OH 43605 by regular U.S. Mail on 3/11/2025. (R,EM)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
6 6 motion Leave Fri 02/28 3:45 PM
Motion pursuant to court order seeking leave to file filed by Plaintiff Kibwe Rayford, Jr.(S,DM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Motion for Judgment,
Att: 2 Lucas County Common Pleas Court Motion for Judgment,
Att: 3 USPS Tracking,
Att: 4 Job Description,
Att: 5 Certificate-Degrees,
Att: 6 Memorandum Opinion and Order
5 5 motion Extension (answer complaint) Fri 02/28 1:04 PM
Motion for extension of time until April 2, 2025 to answer , move or otherwise respond to complaint filed by Defendant Impact Employment Solutions.(Urrutia, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Fri 02/28 2:03 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Impact Employment Solutions answer due 4/2/2025. Judge James R. Knepp II on 2/28/2025. Copy sent to Kibwe Rayford, Apt. A 1657 Botkins Drive Toledo, OH 43605 by regular US Mail on 2/28/2025.(R,EM)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 02/24 6:02 PM
Attorney Appearance by Jade L. Robinson filed by on behalf of Impact Employment Solutions. (Robinson, Jade)
Related: [-]
3 3 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 02/24 2:42 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 02/24 1:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Impact Employment Solutions. (Urrutia, Carrie)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 02/24 1:48 PM
Notice of Removal from Lucas County Common Pleas, case number CI25 - 00193 Filing fee paid $ 405, receipt number AOHNDC-12970692.. Filed by Impact Employment Solutions. (Urrutia, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons and other filings,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 02/24 2:34 PM
Judge James R. Knepp II assigned to case. (S,DM)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 02/24 2:35 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Darrell A. Clay. (S,DM)
Related: [-]