Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Mark G Mastroianni
Case #: 3:25-cv-10447
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Shein US Services, LLC
Represented By
Brian J. Bosworth
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nicole Carter
16 Rochelle St.
Springfield, MA 01109


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
14 14 misc Copy Mailed Wed 04/23 5:00 PM
Copy re13 Scheduling Order, mailed to Plaintiff on 4/23/2025. (TF)
Related: [-]
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/23 4:58 PM
Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER : See Order for complete details. Status Conference set for 7/24/2025 at 11:00 AM in via Telephone before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni . At this conference, the parties should inform the court whether they intend to move for summary judgment on any Phase I issues. If they do not, the court shall set further case management deadlines. Clerk will provide Call-In information prior to hearing.(TF)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 04/23 10:20 AM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni: Scheduling Conference held on 4/23/2025. (Attorneys present: Atty Bosworth) Colloquy re: proposed dates for scheduling. Pro-se Plaintiff did not call-in. Court Clerk confirms sending call-in information via email yesterday afternoon. Court shall issue a scheduling order. (Court Reporter: Leigh Gershowitz at Leigh_Gershowitz@mad.uscourts.gov.) (CR)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
11 11 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Fri 04/18 3:18 PM
Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order and Statement pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Nicole Carter.(MPZ)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
10 10 discov Certification pursuant to Rule 16.1 Wed 04/16 11:52 AM
CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 .(Bosworth, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 04, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Scheduling Conference Fri 04/04 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 4/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Springfield before Judge Mark G. Mastroianni. See attached notice for complete details. (TRL)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
8 8 misc State Court Record - answer filed in state court Fri 03/14 10:20 AM
STATE COURT Record. (TRL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
7 7 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Thu 03/13 11:34 AM
STATE COURT Record. (Bosworth, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 03/03 3:37 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shein US Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Roadget Business Pte. Ltd. for Shein US Services, LLC.. (Bosworth, Brian)
Related: [-]
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 03/03 2:04 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Shein US Services, LLC.(Bosworth, Brian)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
4 4 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Mon 02/24 3:58 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email. Counsel who filed an appearance in this case prior to its removal must refer to[LINK:Local Rule 83.5.3(f)] Practice by Persons Not Members of the Bar on how to proceed as an attorney in this court. General Information for Attorneys can be found[LINK:here] . (MPZ)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Mon 02/24 3:54 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (MPZ)
Related: [-]
2 2 transfer Case Transferred Out - Divisional Transfer Mon 02/24 2:55 PM
Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (NVB)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/24 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nicole Carter ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10854728 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Bosworth, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B