New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer H Rearden
Case #: 1:25-cv-01558
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP
Represented By
Kenneth A. Novikoff
Rivkin Radler, LLP
contact info
William Louis Schleifer
Rivkin Radler
contact info
Defendant
101 Quincy LLC
Defendant
Smart Management NY Inc
Plaintiff
John Hazlett
Represented By
Hashim Rahman
Rahman Legal
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 04/11 5:06 PM
ORDER granting12 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Application GRANTED. Defendant Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP shall respond to the Amended Complaint by May 7, 2025. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 12. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 4/11/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 04/11 5:07 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP answer due 5/7/2025. (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 04/10 3:57 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Kenneth A. Novikoff dated April 10, 2025. Document filed by Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP..(Novikoff, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 04/10 3:19 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 101 Quincy LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
10 10 2 pgs service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 04/09 2:51 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 101 Quincy LLC, re:9 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by John Hazlett..(Rahman, Hashim)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 04/09 2:29 PM
CONSENT AMENDED COMPLAINT amending8 Amended Complaint, against 101 Quincy LLC, Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP, Smart Management NY Inc with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Hazlett. Related document:8 Amended Complaint,..(Rahman, Hashim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit A - Consent Letter
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Wed 04/09 10:20 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Hashim Rahman to RE-FILE Document No. 8 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the pleading; the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/08 10:47 PM
CONSENT AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by John Hazlett..(Rahman, Hashim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent Letter
Thursday, March 06, 2025
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 03/06 5:08 PM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Application GRANTED. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by April 9, 2025. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate ECF No. 6. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer H. Rearden on 3/6/2025) (jca)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 03/06 3:59 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading addressed to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden from Kenneth A. Novikoff dated March 6, 2025. Document filed by Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP..(Novikoff, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 03/06 5:09 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP answer due 4/9/2025. (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/04 1:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hashim Rahman on behalf of John Hazlett..(Rahman, Hashim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/25 10:11 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer H. Rearden. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/25 10:12 AM
Magistrate Judge Gary Stein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/25 10:13 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 02/25 10:14 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Louis Schleifer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 4:27 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Louis Schleifer on behalf of Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP..(Schleifer, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/24 4:26 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth A. Novikoff on behalf of Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP..(Novikoff, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/24 4:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Novikoff, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 02/24 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 659817/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30665691).Document filed by Gutman, Mintz, Baker & Sonnenfeldt, LLP..(Novikoff, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Summons and Complaint