BURBIDGE et al v PFIZER INC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140
Lead case: 3:25-md-03140
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Hope T Cannon |
Case #: | 3:25-cv-00179 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:25-cv-00561 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
GREENSTONE LLC
|
|
Defendant
PFIZER INC
|
|
Defendant
PHARMACIA & UPJOHN CO LLC
|
|
Defendant
PHARMACIA LLC
|
|
Defendant
PRASCO LLC
|
|
Defendant
VIATRIS INC
|
|
Interested Party
JACOB WOODY
|
|
Plaintiff
ANTHON BURBIDGE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER BURBIDGE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Thursday, February 20, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 04, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |