Moen v. Woolridge
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sara Darrow |
Referred: | Ronald L Hanna |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-04047 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:03 AM CDT |
Defendant
John Woolridge
|
|
Plaintiff
Adriane Moen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, April 24, 2025 | ||
order
Order Assigning Referral Judge
Thu 04/24 3:00 PM
|
||
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
9 | 9
![]() MOTION to Allow Service Pursuant to Rule 4(e)(1) by Plaintiff Adriane Moen. Responses due by 5/6/2025 (Ghadiri, Sara) |
|
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/22 9:30 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on April 22, 2025. The U.S. Marshals Service attempted to serve Defendant but was unable to do so because Defendant no longer lives at the address provided. See8 Unexecuted Summons. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to provide the Court with an updated address for Defendant by May 6, 2025. (ARR) |
||
Wednesday, April 16, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Summons Returned Unexecuted by Adriane Moen as to John Woolridge. (BL) |
|
Tuesday, April 08, 2025 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Elizabeth Payne on behalf of Adriane Moen (Payne, Elizabeth) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Evelyn Field on behalf of Adriane Moen (Field, Evelyn) |
|
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to John Woolridge. (BL) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/18 9:03 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on March 18, 2025. Plaintiff has filed a4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The4 motion was submitted under penalty of perjury and demonstrates that Plaintiff should be excused from paying the filing fee in this case, so the4 motion is GRANTED. This case is now in the process of service. Plaintiff is advised to wait until counsel has appeared for Defendant before filing any motions so that Defendant has notice and an opportunity to respond. Motions filed before Defendant's counsel has filed an appearance will generally be denied as premature. The Clerk is directed to prepare a summons and forward it, along with a copy of the1 Complaint and this Text Order, to the U.S. Marshal for service. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). (ARR) |
||
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
4 | 4
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Adriane Moen. Responses due by 3/18/2025 (Ghadiri, Sara) |
|
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 02/26 11:22 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on February 26, 2025. Plaintiff's2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Court requires use of the Long Form Application to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees (Form AO 239), which is available on the United States Courts website. Plaintiff must pay the filing fee or file another application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs using the required form by March 12, 2025. (AV) |
||
order
Order Striking/Vacating Document (NOT a motion)
Wed 02/26 11:51 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 2/26/2025. The Clerk is directed to strike the3 issued summons. The Clerk will issue the summons if Plaintiff pays the filing fee or if the Court grants Plaintiff in forma pauperis status. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b), (c)(3). (JJK) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl)
Wed 02/26 2:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: 3/12/2025 deadline set per 2/26/2025 Text Order. (BL) |
||
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to John Woolridge. Original summons mailed to Plaintiff's counsel to effect service. (JJK) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS , filed by Adriane Moen.(Ghadiri, Sara) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against John Woolridge, filed by Adriane Moen.(Ghadiri, Sara) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |