New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:25-cv-01566
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2sx Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:29 AM EDT
Defendant
Altus Group U.S. Inc.
Plaintiff
Brooke Echard
Represented By
Diana L. Fitzgerald
Fitzgerald & Isaacson, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 05/22 7:13 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Altus Group U.S. Inc.. Document filed by Brooke Echard. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Fitzgerald, Diana)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 02/28 3:17 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Altus Group U.S. Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/27 12:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Altus Group U.S. Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Brooke Echard..(Fitzgerald, Diana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 02/25 10:06 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 02/25 10:06 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 02/25 10:07 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/24 6:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fitzgerald, Diana)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/24 6:57 PM
COMPLAINT against Altus Group U.S. Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30666982)Document filed by Brooke Echard..(Fitzgerald, Diana)
Related: [-]