Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:25-cv-00957
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 21, 2025
Re-opened:May 06, 2025
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 5:15 AM EDT
Defendant
BETH BASHORE
Defendant
BERKS COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES
Defendant
BERKS COUNTY PENNSYLVANIA
Defendant
REBECCA MILL
Defendant
KARLA SANDERS
Defendant
CONSUELO ZAVALA
Plaintiff
JAQUELINE RIOS
1424 LUZERNE STREET
READING, PA 19601
Plaintiff
GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR.
549 N. 9TH STREET
READING, PA 19304

GPO Apr 29 2025
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/29/25. 4/30/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
GPO Apr 29 2025
ORDER OF 4/29/25 THAT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM, LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. ALL OTHER MOTIONS (ECF NOS. 9, 10, 11, 12 AND 13) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/29/25. 4/30/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
19 19 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA Wed 05/14 9:59 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re18 Notice of Appeal filed by GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR.. USCA Case Number 25-1946 (dt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
18 18 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 05/14 8:42 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to15 Order (Memorandum and/or Opinion), by GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR. IFP IFP PREVIOUSLY GRANTED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Wed 05/07 3:45 PM
ORDER OF 5/7/25 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO REOPEN THIS CASE FOR THE PURPOSE OF CONSIDERING THE PENDING MOTION. THE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION UNDER FRCP 59(E) IS DENIED. ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 5/7/25. 5/7/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
16 16 motion Reconsideration Wed 04/30 11:35 AM
MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR., FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S ORDER DISMISSING THE CASE (ECF NO. 29).(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Order Wed 04/30 6:42 AM
ORDER OF 4/29/25 THAT FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM, LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO 18 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. ALL OTHER MOTIONS (ECF NOS. 9, 10, 11, 12 AND 13) ARE DENIED AS MOOT. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/29/25. 4/30/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
14 14 12 pgs order Memorandum and/or Opinion Wed 04/30 6:39 AM
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 4/29/25. 4/30/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(dt)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/28 11:06 AM
MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR., TO HOLD DEFENDANTS INDIVIDUALLY LIABLE..(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Cover Page
12 12 motion Sanctions Mon 04/28 11:04 AM
MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR., FOR SANCTIONS..(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Cover Page
11 11 motion Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem Mon 04/28 11:02 AM
MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS JR., TO APPOINT SPECIAL MASTER OR MONITOR.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Cover Page
10 10 motion Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Mon 04/28 10:56 AM
MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR., FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND/OR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION..(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Cover Page
Saturday, April 26, 2025
9 9 motion Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order Mon 04/28 10:26 AM
MOTION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR., FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law In Support,
Att: 2 Cover Page
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 04/01 3:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JAQUELINE RIOS, GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR. (envelope attached).(er)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/31 7:28 AM
APPLICATION OF PRO SE PLAINTIFF GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR., TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (DT)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Declaration of Signature Mon 03/31 7:26 AM
Declaration of Original Signature filed by GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR. (envelope attached) (dt)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 03/31 7:23 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS BY PRO SE PLAINTIFF JAQUELINE RIOS. (ENVELOPE ATTACHED) (DT)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Declaration of Signature Mon 03/31 7:18 AM
Declaration of Original Signature filed by JAQUELINE RIOS. (envelope attached) (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
misc Remark Fri 02/28 7:27 AM
Document #3 (order) IFP Application and Copy of the Complaint mailed to the Pro Se Plaintiffs. (DT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order Thu 02/27 3:14 PM
ORDER OF 2/27/25 THAT UPON CONSIDERATION THAT THE PLAINTIFF'S HAVE FAILED TO SIGNED THEIR COMPLAINT AS REQUIRED. NO PLAINTIFF HAS SOUGHT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. UPON CONSIDERATION OF THE COMPLAINT, IT IS ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND EACH PLAINTIFF A NON-PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. IPLAINITFFS SEEK TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS EACH SHALL WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND TO EACH PLAINTIFF A COPY OF THIS ORDER WITH THE ATTACHED DECLARATION FORM AND A COPY OF THE COMPLAINT. NEITHER VARGAS NOR RIOS HAVE SIGNED THE COMPLAINT. IF VARGAS AND/OR RIOS SEEK TO PROCCED IN THIS CSE, EACH INDIVIDUAL IS DIRECTED TO COMPLETE AND RETURN THE DECLARATION FORM, WITH AN ORIGINAL SIGNATURE, TO THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. NO SUMMONS WILL ISSUE AT THIS TIME. ANY PLAIKNTIFF WHO DOES NOT FULLY COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE AS A PARTY TO THIS CASE. IF NO PLAINTIFF COMPLIES WITH THIS ORDER, THIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY JUDGE: JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 2/27/25. 2/27/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (COPIES NOT MAILED) (DT)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Mon 02/24 8:43 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. (e-mailed to pro se plaintiff Gerardo Rosendo VArgas, Jr. (mailed to pro se plaintiff Jaqueline Rios) (Attachments: #1 E-Consent Notice to Pro Se Plaintiff Mailed to Jaqueline Rios)(dt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/24 8:37 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against BETH BASHORE, BERKS COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES, BERKS COUNTY PENNSYLVANIA, REBECCA MILL, KARLA SANDERS, CONSUELO ZAVALA, filed by JAQUELINE RIOS, GERARDO ROSENDO VARGAS, JR.(dt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Page