Alabama Northern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00465
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 25, 2025 1:20 AM CST
Defendant
Amori Mekiyel Davis (1)
Represented By
Kevyn Armstrong-Wright
Office Of The Federal Public Defender Nd/al
contact info
Robin P Robertson
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Kevin L Butler
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Prim F. Escalona, US Attorney
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
US Probation
United States Probation Office
contact info
John B Felton
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
USM
United States Marshal
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/25/2025 1:32 AM CST
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
1 1 INDICTMENT as to dft Amori Mekiyel Davis (1) count(s) 1. Please file all subsequent documents using the criminal case number assigned to this indictment. (KBB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (SEALED) Signed Indictment
2 2 MOTION to Seal Indictment filed by USA as to dft Amori Mekiyel Davis. (KBB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER granting2 Motion to Seal Indictment as to dft Amori Mekiyel Davis (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 11/27/2024. (KBB)
Related: [-]