New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:25-cv-01574
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 6:30 AM EDT
Defendant
SA Hospitality Group, LLC
Represented By
Joseph James DiPalma
Jackson Lewis P.C. (wp)
contact info
Kseniya Zilberman
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Yelitza Picon
Represented By
Gabriel Levy
Gabriel A. Levy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 misc Proposed Consent Order Tue 05/06 12:12 PM
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER. Document filed by SA Hospitality Group, LLC..(DiPalma, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
10 10 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 04/14 12:18 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court is in receipt of a letter from the parties stating that they have reached a settlement in principle [ECF No. 9]. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the parties are unable to memorialize their settlement in writing and if the application to restore the action is made by May 30, 2025. If no such application is made by that date, today's dismissal of the action is with prejudice. See Muze, Inc. v. Digital On Demand, Inc., 356 F.3d 492, 494 n.1 (2d Cir. 2004). All other dates and deadlines are adjourned sine die. The Clerk of Court respectfully is requested to terminate the letter motion at ECF No. 8. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 5/30/2025.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 4/14/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 04/10 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Settlement . Document filed by Yelitza Picon..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/27 10:19 AM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:1 Complaint from April 1, 2025 to May 1, 2025 addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Joseph J. DiPalma dated March 27, 2025. Document filed by SA Hospitality Group, LLC..(DiPalma, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kseniya Zilberman on behalf of SA Hospitality Group, LLC..(Zilberman, Kseniya)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 9:59 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph James DiPalma on behalf of SA Hospitality Group, LLC..(DiPalma, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/13 11:52 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. SA Hospitality Group, LLC served on 3/11/2025, answer due 4/1/2025. Service was accepted by Kimberly Vatero. Document filed by Yelitza Picon..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 02/26 10:05 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SA Hospitality Group, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 02/26 10:00 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 02/26 10:00 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 02/26 10:01 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/25 9:29 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SA Hospitality Group, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Yelitza Picon..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/25 9:28 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/25 9:27 AM
COMPLAINT against SA Hospitality Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30668513)Document filed by Yelitza Picon..(Levy, Gabriel)
Related: [-]