Minnesota District Court
Judge:Patrick J Schiltz
Referred: Dulce J Foster
Case #: 0:25-cv-00708
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2025
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 5:12 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Matthew Charles Paczkowski
c/o 15897 295th Avenue
Waseca, MN 56093
Counter Defendant
Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis
Counter Defendant
Magnifi Financial Credit Union
Represented By
Daniel M Duffek
Segal Duffek Moen, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Matthew Charles Paczkowski
c/o 15897 295th Avenue
Waseca, MN 56093
Plaintiff
Magnifi Financial Credit Union
Represented By
Daniel M Duffek
Segal Duffek Moen, PLLC
contact info

GPO Feb 28 2025
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Notice of Removal to Federal Court and Amended Counterclaim. See Report and Recommendation for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 2/28/2025. (AEJ)
GPO Mar 12 2025
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c), this matter is REMANDED to the Minnesota District Court, Third Judicial District. 2. Defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's affidavit in support of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and to deny plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [ECF No. 8] is DENIED AS MOOT. 3. Defendant's motion to stay state court proceedings [ECF No. 22] is DENIED AS MOOT. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/12/2025. (KAD)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
25 25 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Thu 03/13 1:13 PM
JUDGMENT(BTX)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
24 24 misc Letter from Clerk's Office to County District Court or Government Agency re: Remand Order Thu 03/13 1:04 PM
LETTER from Clerk's Office to Waseca County District Court enclosing23 Order of Remand. cc: Waseca County District Court. (BTX)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendation Order on Motion to Strike Pleading Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/12 11:23 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c), this matter is REMANDED to the Minnesota District Court, Third Judicial District. 2. Defendant's motion to strike plaintiff's affidavit in support of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and to deny plaintiff's motion for summary judgment [ECF No. 8] is DENIED AS MOOT. 3. Defendant's motion to stay state court proceedings [ECF No. 22] is DENIED AS MOOT. LET JUDGMENT BE ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 3/12/2025. (KAD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/11 11:18 AM
EMERGENCY MOTION TO ENFORCE REMOVAL STAY AND HALT UNLAWFUL STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(CLK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Monday, March 10, 2025
21 21 service Certificate of Service Mon 03/10 11:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Matthew Charles Paczkowski re20 Proposed Order to Judge - Other,19 Affidavit in Support,18 Memorandum,17 Objection to Report and Recommendations (CLK)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Mon 03/10 11:57 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Denying Remand. (CLK)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Mon 03/10 11:53 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Matthew Charles Paczkowski in SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(CLK)
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs respm Memorandum Mon 03/10 11:52 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT re17 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(CLK)
Related: [-]
17 17 respoth Objection/No Objection to Report and Recommendations Mon 03/10 11:51 AM
OBJECTION TO7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(CLK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
16 16 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Findings of Fact/Conclusions of Law Mon 03/03 3:15 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE RE FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW AND JUDGMENT filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski. (MMP)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Mon 03/03 3:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Matthew Charles Paczkowski in SUPPORT OF8 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Affidavit filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(MMP)
Related: [-]
14 14 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/03 3:03 PM
DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of re8 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Summary Judgment filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(MMP)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/03 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Filing re:1 Notice of Removal filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski. (MMP)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Mon 03/03 2:53 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re:8 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Summary Judgment filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(MMP)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Affidavit in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/03 2:49 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Matthew Charles Paczkowski in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(MMP)
Related: [-]
10 10 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 03/03 2:46 PM
MEMORANDUM Of Law in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Demand for Trial by Jury filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski. (MMP) Modified text on 3/3/2025 (MMP)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Mon 03/03 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement and Demand for Trial by Jury filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski. Date and time to be determined. (MMP)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Strike Pleading Mon 03/03 2:29 PM
DEFENDANT'S MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Summary Judgment Motion and to Deny Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Motion re:1 Notice of Removal - Attachments 1-17 and 1-19 filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(MMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, February 28, 2025
7 7 motion Report and Recommendation Fri 02/28 5:06 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re1 Notice of Removal to Federal Court and Amended Counterclaim. See Report and Recommendation for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster on 2/28/2025. (AEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
6 6 notice Notice re: Removed and Transferred Cases Tue 02/25 11:19 AM
(Text-Only) Notice re: Removals & Transfers Motions that are pending upon removal or transfer are automatically terminated. You must refile the motions consistent with the[LINK:local rules] if you would like them to be considered by this court. (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
5 5 misc Affidavit (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings) Tue 02/25 11:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT of MATTHEW CHARLES PACZKOWSKI IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL re1 Notice of Removal byMatthew Charles Paczkowski. (jam)
Related: [-]
4 4 PPro_se Request Tue 02/25 11:13 AM
PETITIONER'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS re1 Notice of Removal filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(jam) Modified text on 2/25/2025 (jam)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Exhibit/Exhibit List (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings) Tue 02/25 11:11 AM
EXHIBIT A-R re1 Notice of Removal filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski. (jam) Modified text on 2/25/2025 (jam)
Related: [-]
2 2 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Tue 02/25 11:10 AM
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Federal Reserve Bank of Minneapolis, Magnifi Financial Credit Union. filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski.(jam)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/25 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Waseca County District Court - Third Judicial District, case number 81-CV-24-860 (filing fee $405, receipt number AMNDC-0000941) filed by Matthew Charles Paczkowski. Case assigned to Judge Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. (jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USDC Complaint,
Att: 2 Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) State Court Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Case Filing and Assignment,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) State Court Reply to Counter Claim,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) State Court Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Affirmative Defenses and Reply to Counterclaims,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) State Court Request for Production of Documents,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Mistake,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) State Court Letter from Defendant to Plaintiff,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) State Court Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Rule 26.01 Disclosures and Proposed Discovery Plan,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) State Court Defendant's Motion for a Jury Trial,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) State Court Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) State Court Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) State Court Defendant's Affidavit in Support of Motion for Jury Trial,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Motion and Motion for Jury Trial,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) State Court Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) State Court Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, Issuance of Replevin Order, and Dismissal of Counter-Claims,
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) State Court Affidavit of Daniel M. Duffek in Support of Summary Judgment,
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) State Court Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Summary Judgment,
Att: 21 Exhibit(s) State Court Cover Sheet for Non-Public Documents,
Att: 22 Exhibit(s) State Court Notice of Remote Zoom Hearing,
Att: 23 Civil Cover Sheet