Arizona District Court
Judge:Krissa M Lanham
Case #: 2:25-cv-00636
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 3:02 AM MST
Defendant
Mountainside Fitness Acquisitions LLC
Plaintiff
Lisa Jordan
Represented By
Jessica Elizabeth Miller
Robinson Law Offices
contact info
Krista Summer Robinson
Robinson Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
10 10 6 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 03/19 10:14 AM
ORDER - Both counsel and pro se litigants must abide by the Rules of Practice of the U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona ("Local Rules") and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this order on defendant(s) and file a notice of service with the Clerk of Court. FURTHER ORDERED that, unless the Court orders otherwise, on May 30, 2025, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any defendant in the United States that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Krissa M Lanham on 3/19/2025. (NSH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 03/18 9:42 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Krissa M Lanham. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 25-00636 PHX-KML. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for April 8, 2025 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
6 6 misc 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause (LRCiv 3.7(b)) Mon 03/17 2:54 PM
ORDER that Lisa Jordan show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Judge John J Tuchi. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/8/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 505, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge John J Tuchi.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Instructions,
Att: 2 Consent Form
misc 25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge Tue 03/18 9:40 AM
Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order Thu 03/13 3:07 PM
ORDER until all parties have consented to magistrate judge jurisdiction, or until any party has requested reassignment to a district judge, (A) Although Judge Metcalf's chambers are at the courthouse in Yuma, any chambers copies of filings for Magistrate Judge Metcalf provided pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.4 or Section II(D)(3) of the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be forwarded c/o Office of Clerk of Court, U.S. District Court District of Arizona, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, AZ 85003. (B) The parties are encouraged (but not required) to limit chambers copies to the categories specified in Section II(D)(3) of the ECF manual, including: a. complaints; b. notices of removal; c. motions to dismiss and responses and replies thereto; d. motions for summary judgment and responses and replies thereto; e. motions for temporary restraining order [or preliminary relief] and supporting documents; f. sealed documents; g. documents exceeding 10 pages in length, including exhibits and attachments." Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 3/13/25. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 02/25 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Mountainside Fitness Acquisitions LLC. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Tue 02/25 10:49 AM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-24011655. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James F Metcalf. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 25-00636 PHX-JFM. Magistrate Election form attached.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
2 2 service Summons Submitted Tue 02/25 10:47 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Lisa Jordan. (submitted by Jessica Miller) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/25 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-24011655 filed by Lisa Jordan. (submitted by Jessica Miller)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-2,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet